Florida Middle District Court
Judge:James S Moody, Jr
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:18-cv-00275
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2018
Terminated:Jan 14, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Dec 01, 2018 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kathleen Carlson
Boyd & Jenerette, PA
contact info
Jane Anderson
Boyd & Jenerette, PA
contact info
Aaron Robert Baker
Law Offices Of Robert J. Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Lightheart
Represented By
John B. Fuller
Fuller & Fuller
contact info
Gordon Johnson Glover
Glover Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Monday, January 14, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order dismissing case Mon 01/14 8:34 AM
30-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 13 Notice of Settlement. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/14/2019. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 12, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of settlement Sat 01/12 10:11 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Baker, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
utility Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC Mon 07/23 4:05 PM
Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/15/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/15/2019. (HAQ)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2018
12 12 order Case management and scheduling order Fri 07/20 3:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2019, Dispositive motions due by 5/31/2019, Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, DECEMBER 10, 2019 at 10:15 AM before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Parties shall coordinate a telephone conference call and contact Chambers at (813) 301-5680. Jury Trial set for JANUARY 2020 trial term before Judge James S. Moody Jr., at the U.S. Courthouse, 207 N.W. Second Street, Ocala, Florida. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/20/2018. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
11 11 misc Case Management Report Thu 07/19 10:07 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Baker, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/05 2:56 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Baker, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
9 9 7 pgs order Order on motion to dismiss Thu 06/21 9:54 AM
ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 6 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's claim in count II for bad faith is hereby ABATED until further order from this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/21/2018. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Thu 06/14 4:32 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gary Lightheart. Related case(s): no (Glover, Gordon)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/14 4:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Gary Lightheart. (Glover, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
6 6 motion Dismiss Thu 06/07 2:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Anderson, Jane)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Thu 06/07 2:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Anderson, Jane)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Thu 06/07 2:43 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Anderson, Jane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
3 3 order Related case order and track 2 notice Tue 06/05 8:51 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 6/5/2018. (AD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 06/04 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Gary Lightheart. (Originally filed in state court)(LMF)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 06/04 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 5th Judicial Circuit in and for Marion County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-851 filed in State Court on 4/28/18. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number OCA-9255 filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(LMF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2 to Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibits 5-7 to Removal,
Att: 3 State Record,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet