Gusman v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45663 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:18-cv-04828 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:58 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frederick Floyd
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orleans Parish Sheriff's Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlin N. Gusman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:32 PM EDT |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 6/6/2018.] | |
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |