District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:18-cv-01375
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause16:1540 Endangered Species Act
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2018
Terminated:Nov 21, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 5:15 AM EST
Defendant
JIM KURTH
Represented By
Frederick Harter Turner
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By
Frederick Harter Turner
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By
Frederick Harter Turner
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
RYAN ZINKE
Represented By
Frederick Harter Turner
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By
Elise Pautler Bennett
Center For Biological Diversity
contact info

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2019
39 39 order .Order Thu 11/21 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of parties' joint status report, Dkt.38 , the Court ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED as MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/21/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
38 38 misc Status Report Wed 11/20 8:56 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE. (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
37 37 order .Order Thu 11/14 8:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation to Resolve Plaintiff's Claim For Attorneys' Fees, Dkt. 36, it is hereby ORDERED that the joint stipulation is APPROVED. The parties shall comply with the terms of the joint stipulation, Dkt. 36, which the Court adopts in full. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 21, 2019, indicating whether, in light of the Court's approval of the parties' joint stipulation, the Court should dismiss the case as moot. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/14/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11/14 9:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
36 36 misc Stipulation Wed 11/13 2:43 PM
STIPULATION to Resolve Plaintiff's Claim for Attorneys' Fees by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE.(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 04, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/04 12:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' sixth joint status report, Dkt. 34, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter will remain STAYED until November 15, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 15, 2019, apprising the Court of whether any additional proceedings are needed. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/04/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
35 35 motion Extension of Time to Fri 11/01 2:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE (ztd); (See docket entry no.34 to view.)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 11/01 1:50 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Extension of the Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE.(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2019
33 33 motion Stay Fri 10/04 11:53 AM
MOTION to Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE (ztd); (See docket entry no.32 to view.)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 10/03 2:40 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Extension of the Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE.(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Thu 10/03 3:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' fifth joint status report, Dkt. 32, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter will remain STAYED until November 1, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/03/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 10/04 10:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (dot)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/09 9:39 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/06 7:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' fourth joint status report, Dkt. 30, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter will remain stayed until October 4, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/06/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
31 31 motion Stay Fri 09/06 11:33 AM
MOTION to Stay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (ztd); (See docket entry no.30 to view.)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Status Report Thu 09/05 3:53 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Extension of the Stay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Bennett, Elise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2019
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Mon 08/12 10:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE (ztd); (See docket entry no.28 to view.)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 08/09 1:30 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Extension of the Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE.(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Fri 08/09 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' third joint status report, Dkt. 28, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings are stayed until September 6, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/09/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 08/09 4:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
order .Order Wed 07/24 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Second Joint Status Report and Request to Extend the Stay, Dkt. 26, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings are stayed until August 9, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/24/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/24 10:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/22 8:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Tue 07/23 3:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE (ztd); (See docket entry no.26 to view.)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 07/19 11:39 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Extension of the Stay by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE.(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Fri 07/19 6:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' Second Joint Status Report and Request to Extend the Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings are stayed until August 9, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/19/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 06/10 11:38 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 09, 2019
order .Order Sun 06/09 8:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Parties' Joint Status Report and Request to Stay Proceedings, Dkt. 24, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are STAYED until July 19, 2019 and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. 15, is hereby DENIED as MOOT. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/9/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
25 25 motion Stay Mon 06/10 10:09 AM
MOTION to Stay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (ztd); (See docket entry no.24 .)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 06/07 5:50 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Stay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Bennett, Elise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
order .Order Tue 06/04 10:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's May 30, 2019 Minute Order and the Federal Defendants' notice of submission of final rule, Dkt. 23, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/4/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Thu 05/30 8:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Federal Defendants' notice of submission of final rule, Dkt. 23, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to extend the stay, Dkt. 12, is DENIED as MOOT. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before June 12, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/30/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/30 9:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/28 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Submission of Final Rule to Office of the Federal Register by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
22 22 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 04/02 8:06 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction CORRECTED with counsel signature filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Atwood, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata
21 21 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 04/02 7:44 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Wed 04/03 7:53 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re21 Reply to opposition to Motion, was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as docket entry no.22 . (ztd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
20 20 respm Response to motion Tue 03/26 3:30 PM
RESPONSE re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE. (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 03/26 3:18 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Proceedings filed by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE. (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
17 17 13 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 03/18 11:35 AM
Corrected Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Proceedings filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (ztd)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/18 9:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's memorandum of law in opposition to Federal Defendants' motion for extension of stay is hereby accepted for re-filing. The corrected memorandum, Dkt. 16-1, is, accordingly, DEEMED FILED. It is further ORDERED that the Federal Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion for a stay and response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on or before March 26, 2019, and Plaintiffs shall file a reply in support of their motion for summary judgment on or before April 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/18/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/18 10:26 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion for a stay and response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on or before 3/26/2019; Plaintiffs shall file a reply in support of their motion for summary judgment on or before 4/2/2019. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/13 9:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY(Atwood, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lodged Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
18 18 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 03/19 9:17 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Proceedings filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (See Docket Entry15 to view document). (znmw)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Declaratory Judgment Permanent Injunction Tue 03/12 12:40 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Declaratory Judgment , MOTION for Permanent Injunction by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY(Atwood, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Declaration Amy R. Atwood,
Att: 4 Declaration D. Noah Greenwald,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - ESA Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit B - Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit C - Slip Op.,
Att: 8 Exhibit D - Slip Op.,
Att: 9 Exhibit E - Email,
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 11, 2019
notice Notice of QC Mon 03/11 7:39 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re13 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to atwood@biologicaldiversity.org, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The Motion for Summary Judgment needs to be entered on the docket. (ztd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit Fri 03/08 11:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT re13 Memorandum in Opposition by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy)
Related: [-]
13 13 12 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 03/08 11:51 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Proceedings filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
12 12 motion Extension of Time to Fri 02/22 4:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Stay Proceedings by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit NOI Response,
Att: 2 Exhibit Frazer Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 08, 2019
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 02/08 2:17 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE. (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/28 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Restoration of Appropriations by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/24 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion to stay, Dkt. 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The current stay shall remain in effect until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report within 14 days of Congress appropriating funding for the Department of Justice and Federal Defendants to resume work. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/24/2019. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
9 9 motion Stay Wed 01/23 3:32 PM
MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 27, 2018
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 08/27 9:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion to stay proceedings, Dkt.8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Further proceedings in this case shall be STAYED until FWS's submission to the Federal Register of the critical habitat designation or January 31, 2019, whichever is sooner. It is further ORDERED that, upon Defendants' submission to the Office of the Federal Register of the final critical habitat designation, the Parties meet and confer and, within 14 days, file a joint status report regarding any further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/27/2018. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
8 8 motion Stay Fri 08/24 3:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 06, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mon 08/06 9:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, Dkt.7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2018. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/06 9:32 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/31/2018. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Fri 08/03 2:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE(Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, July 19, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/19 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Harter Turner on behalf of All Defendants (Turner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 07/09 9:25 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/17/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/18/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JIM KURTH served on 6/18/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/18/2018; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 6/18/2018; RYAN ZINKE served on 6/18/2018 (Bennett, Elise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 06/13 10:41 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd)
Related: [-]
3 3 order .Order Wed 06/13 9:40 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/13/2018. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/11 10:22 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Bennett, Elise)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/11 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT against JIM KURTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5526143) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Bennett, Elise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons for Ryan Zinke,
Att: 3 Summons for U.S. Department of the Interior,
Att: 4 Summons for Jim Kurth,
Att: 5 Summons for U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service,
Att: 6 Summons for Attorney General,
Att: 7 Summons for U.S. Attorney
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/12 3:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd)
Related: [-]