Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00140
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jun 15, 2018 4:06 AM EDT
defendant
Johaun Lamont Howland (1)
Represented By
Helen C. Nieuwenhuis
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
R. Clay Stiffler
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO May 21 2018
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Johaun Howland; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)[1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
GPO Jul 30 2018
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Teyon Rosser-Burch; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
GPO Sep 18 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Teyon Rosser-Burch as to Counts 1,6,7, and 9 of the Second Superseding Indictment be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)
GPO Oct 03 2018
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 116 as to Teyon Rosser-Burch; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Nov 28 2018
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Justin David Martin; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)
GPO Feb 19 2019
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Malik Saladian Green as to Counts 1, 2 and 7 of the Fourth Superseding Indictment be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
GPO Mar 06 2019
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 208, with the exception of the recommendation to accept the written plea agreement as to Malik Saladian Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Mar 06 2019
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 208, with the exception of the recommendation to accept the written plea agreement as to Malik Saladian Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Mar 12 2019
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 216 as to Jacarr Devon Cox; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO May 15 2019
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Sterling Wesley Hickmon, II; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
GPO Jul 14 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Jamica Taylor as to the Felony Information be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
GPO Jul 30 2020
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 530 as to Jamica Taylor; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
GPO Jul 23 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Christian Yvonne Newbern as to the Felony Information be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
GPO Jul 30 2020
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 530 as to Jamica Taylor; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
GPO Aug 07 2020
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 563 as to Christian Yvonne Newbern; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Aug 07 2020
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 562 as to Justin David Martin; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Feb 11 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Sterling Wesley Hickmon, II as to Counts 1 and 2 of the Sixth Superseding Indictment be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
GPO Feb 26 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 673 as to Sterling Wesley Hickmon, II; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Feb 26 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 673 as to Sterling Wesley Hickmon, II; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
GPO Mar 09 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 684 as to Mark Anthony Martin; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)

Docket last updated: 11/20/2019 7:36 PM EST
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Johaun Howland; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) Modified text on 5/16/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Continuation of Criminal Complaint
3 3 1 pgs MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) Modified text on 5/16/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Criminal Complaint1 as to Johaun Howland (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) Modified text on 5/16/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
WARRANT EXECUTED; defendant Johaun Howland arrested by DEA agent Jon Schafer in Grand Rapids, MI (USM Control Room, mac) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Johaun Howland pursuant to executed warrant (sjc) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of FIRST APPEARANCE of defendant Johaun Howland CASE UNSEALED; Defendant's request for court-appointed counsel was granted; Defendant remanded to USM custody pending further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 financial affidavit by defendant Johaun Howland in support of request for court-appointed counsel (ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as counsel for defendant Johaun Howland; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
DEFENDANT Johaun Howland will be represented by Helen C. Nieuwenhuis (Federal Public Defender, ) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs ORDER SCHEDULING PROGRESSION OF CASE as to defendant Johaun Howland: preliminary hearing and detention hearings are set for 5/21/2018 at 09:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
8 8 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Johaun Howland [Access to this document is available to the Court and temporarily available to attorney(s) for USA, Johaun Howland only] (USPO Koon, Matthew)/jae)) Modified to revoke attorney access on 5/21/2018 (ald). [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
9 9 1 pgs MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of preliminary hearing and DETENTION hearing as to defendant Johaun Howland; Government called DEA TFO Jon Schafer for testimony; Government Exhibits 1-2 received; Probable Cause Found; Defendant detained and bound over to the Grand Jury for further proceedings (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ORDER that defendant Johaun Howland is bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury status conference or if indicted, arraignment and initial pretrial conference are set for 6/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Johaun Howland; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00145-PJG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
12 12 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Johaun Lamont Howland (ns)
Related: [-]