Ward v. Modere, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00426 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 3:41 AM CST |
Defendant
Modere, Inc.
588 South 2000
West Springville, UT 84663 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessie Lee Ward
8733 Delcris Dr.
Montgomery Village, MD 20886 |
Represented By
|
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff Jessie Lee Ward's 5 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/6/2018. (daj, ) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ORDER GRANTING34 AGREED MOTION TO DISMISSWITH PREJUDICE. All relief not previously granted is hereby denied. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/26/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 11/02 10:24 AM
By agreement of the parties and as approved by Judge Mazzant, the parties' deadline to submit closing documents is extended to November 30, 2018. (tls) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER. On or before November 2, 2018, all parties shall file with the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/3/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
![]() NOTICE of Settlement from Mediator Robert Jenevein by Jessie Lee Ward (Henry, Byron) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by Modere, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Jessie Lee Ward .(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively filed by Jessie Lee Ward . (Henry, Byron) |
|
28 | 28
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION for Discovery Limited filed by Jessie Lee Ward .(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively filed by Modere, Inc. .(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
26 | 26
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION for Discovery Limited filed by Modere, Inc. .(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Stay Merit-Based Discovery Pending the Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Modere, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER re21 MOTION for Discovery Limited and re22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively . Responses must be filed no later than Friday, September 14, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Replies must be filed no later than Monday, September 17, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/11/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively . Plaintiff shall have until September 24, 2018, to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/10/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() MOTION for Discovery Limited by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 09/10 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively20 submitted by Jessie Lee Ward. The Motion should be filed as separate Motions instead of one document. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) |
||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint against Modere, Inc., filed by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE by Jessie Lee Ward of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum to Non-Party(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 08/28 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE by Jessie Lee Ward of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Non-Party15 submitted by Jessie Lee Ward. Pursuant to Local Rule 5, 'each exhibit or attachment must be a separate PDF document and identified with specificity.' Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) |
||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Change Venue Alternatively by Modere, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE by Jessie Lee Ward of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Non-Party (Henry, Byron) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Modere, Inc..(Katz, Marc) Modified on 8/27/2018 (rpc, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 08/27 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue14 submitted by Modere, Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule 5, 'each exhibit or attachment must be a separate PDF document and identified with specificity.' Each exhibit attached to the Motion needs to have a brief description. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) |
||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2018. Discovery due by 2/4/2019. Expert Witness List due by 10/29/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2018. Jury instructions due by 7/19/2019. Mediation Completion due by 10/1/2018. Motions due by 3/6/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/20/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 08/16 9:35 AM
Due to the Court's civil trial schedule, the August 20, 2018 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls) |
||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff Jessie Lee Ward's5 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/6/2018. (daj, ) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Modere, Inc. . (Katz, Marc) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand filed by Jessie Lee Ward . (Henry, Byron) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand filed by Modere, Inc. .(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/3/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 8/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/29/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER AND ADVISORY. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Defendant's amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendant's answer shall be extended to the date set by this order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/27/2018. (rpc, ) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Remand by Jessie Lee Ward.(Henry, Byron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to3 Petition by Modere, Inc.(rpc, ) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** Petition against Modere, Inc., filed by Jessie Lee Ward.(rpc, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Modere, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Maple Mountain Enterprises Inc. for Modere, Inc.. (Katz, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Modere, Inc. from 416th Judicial District Court of Collin County, case number 416-04629-2017. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6817175), filed by Modere, Inc..(Katz, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Att: 33
![]() |
||
Att: 34
![]() |
||
Att: 35
![]() |
||
Att: 36
![]() |
||
Att: 37
![]() |
||
Att: 38
![]() |
||
Att: 39
![]() |
||
Att: 40
![]() |
||
Att: 41
![]() |
||
Att: 42
![]() |
||
Att: 43
![]() |
||
Att: 44
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/15 4:41 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 06/15 4:42 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, ) |