New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00163
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Jun 21, 2018 3:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Mojtaba Biria (1)
Represented By
Robert G. Wells
Office Of Robert G. Wells
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael S. Barnett
Office Of United States Attorney - Albany
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2019 11:49 AM EDT
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mojtaba Biria (1). (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Mojtaba Biria. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Mojtaba Biria (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/22/2017.(tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Public Order
Friday, November 24, 2017
Case unsealed as to Mojtaba Biria on oral motion by the government, and on oral order granting motion in open court, on 11/24/2017. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Appearances: Michael Barnett, AUSA for Government. Defendant appears without counsel. The Government makes an oral motion to unseal the complaint; the Court grants Government's request. Complaint is UNSEALED. The Defendant is advised of rights, maximum penalties and is given a copy of the complaint. The Defendant states that he will retain his own counsel; the Court advises the Defendant to retain an attorney who can represent his interests in the United States (specifically the Northern District of New York). Defendant is also advised of his right to Consulary Notification; Defendant requests Consulary Notification. The Court directs the Government to notify the German Consulate. Finally, the Court inquires as to whether or not the Defendant requires a translator. The Defendant requests a Farsi translator. A detention hearing is scheduled for Monday, November 27, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. Defendant is remanded. (Time: 10:00 - 10:12 a.m.) (CRD: D. Krug/FTR recorded) (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
5 5 Letter from Oliver S. Storch, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Mojtaba Biria requesting an adjournment of the detention hearing until 11/29/2017 @ 3:00 PM (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
6 6 TEXT ORDER as to Mojtaba Biria approving5 Letter Request filed by Mojtaba Biria. The Detention Hearing is reset for 11/29/2017 @ 3:00 PM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/27/2017. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard D. Belliss appearing for USA as co-counsel with Attorney Michael S. Barnett (Belliss, Richard) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert G. Wells appearing for Mojtaba Biria (Wells, Robert) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Detention Hearing as to Mojtaba Biria held on 11/30/2017. Appearances by AUSA Michael Barnett, for the government; Robert Wells, Esq. and Steven Metcalf, II, Esq. appearing as retained counsel for Defendant. USPO Kelly Hart present. The government continues to seek detention based on Defendants risk of flight. Defendant waives his right to a detention hearing at this time, reserving his right to reapply for a hearing if circumstances change. Pretrial services recommends detention. Defendant waives his right to a Preliminary hearing. Defendant is Ordered detained pending trial and is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino) (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Mojtaba Biria. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/30/2017. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
10 10 STIPULATION by USA to 60 Day Enlargement of Time(Barnett, Michael) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
11 11 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mojtaba Biria. Time excluded from 12/1/2017 until 1/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/1/2017. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
12 12 STIPULATION by USA to 60 Day Enlargement of Time(Barnett, Michael) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
13 13 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mojtaba Biria, Time excluded from 1/30/2018 until 3/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/30/2018. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
14 14 STIPULATION by USA to 60 Day Enlargement of Time(Barnett, Michael) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
15 15 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mojtaba Biria Time excluded from 4/3/2018 until 6/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/3/2018. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
TEXT NOTICE OF WAIVER AND PLEA HEARING as to Mojtaba Biria (1:18-cr-163 MAD): A Waiver and Plea Hearing is set for 6/20/2018 at 12:30 PM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
16 16 STIPULATION by USA to 60 Day Enlargement of Time(Barnett, Michael) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
17 17 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Mojtaba Biria; Time excluded from 5/30/2018 until 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/30/2018. (tab) [1:17-mj-00521-CFH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
TEXT Minute Entry for Arraignment/Waiver and Plea Hearing as to Mojtaba Biria held on 6/20/2018 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Michael Barnett, AUSA for the Government; Robert G. Wells, Esq. for the defendant Related [+]; Farsi Interpreter - Javad Dadgostari (sworn); and PO Sheffer; The defendant is sworn, advised of rights, maximum penalties, and questioned by the Court; The waiver of indictment is executed in open court; The waiver of indictment is accepted by the Court; Information 1:18-cr-163 MAD is handed up for filing; A written plea agreement is handed up for filing; Plea Agreement Accepted as to Mojtaba Biria; Plea entered by Mojtaba Biria (1) Guilty Count 1; The Court accepts the defendant's plea of Guilty to Count 1 of the Information; Judge D'Agostino directs probation to prepare and submit a presentence investigation report; Sentencing is set for October 22, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Albany before Judge D'Agostino; Defendant Remanded. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino, CRD Britney Norton [Time 12:42 p.m. - 1:35 p.m.]) (ban)
Related: [-] tained
18 18 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Mojtaba Biria. (ban)
Related: [-]
19 19 INFORMATION as to Mojtaba Biria (1) count 1. (ban)
Related: [-]
20 20 24 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Mojtaba Biria. (ban)
Related: [-]
21 21 GUIDELINE ORDER as to Mojtaba Biria: Sentencing is set for 10/22/2018 at 11:30 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/1/2018, Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/1/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/20/2018. (ban)
Related: [-]