1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Jay Brodsky. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|
2
|
|
2
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jay Brodsky. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (Landow, Concetta) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/10/2018) (Landow, Concetta). [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Complaint
|
5
|
|
5
Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case 18-CV-2788(JS)(AYS). (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Letter from Pro Se Dept. dtd 5/11/2018 to Jay Brodsky acknowledging receipt to the civil action. (Cubano, Jazmin) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-5528-JS-AYS, 17-cv-5529-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6031-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6032-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6033-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6555-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6556-JS-AYS, 17-cv-7085-JS-AYS, 18-1998 JS-AYS, 18-cv-2006-JS-AYS and 18-cv-3304-JS-AYS (Cox, Dwayne)[Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-5528-JS-AYS, 17-cv-5529-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6031-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6032-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6033-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6555-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6556-JS-AYS, 17-cv-7085-JS-AYS, 18-cv-1998-JS-AYS, 18-cv-2006-JS-AYS, 18-cv-3484-JS-AYS and 18-cv-3304-JS-AYS (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-5528-JS-AYS, 17-cv-5529-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6031-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6032-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6033-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6555-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6556-JS-AYS, 17-cv-7085-JS-AYS, 18-cv-1998-JS-AYS, 18-cv-2006-JS-AYS, 18-cv-3486-JS-AYS and 18-cv-3304-JS-AYS (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
6
pgs
MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiffs applications are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO A RENEWAL THEREOF UPON COMPLETION OF THE AO 239 IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION FORM ANNEXED TO THIS ORDER TOGETHER WITH A COPY OF THE "OFFICIAL BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES CREDIT APPLICATION" MARTIN PROVIDED TO BMW AS IS ALLEGED IN THE JUNE 1ST COMPLAINT. EACH PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO RETURN A SEPARATE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION IN EACH ABOVE- CAPTIONED CASE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is DENIED for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the pro se Plaintiffs. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 6/18/2018. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
AO 239 Long Form
|
11
|
|
11
Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-5528-JS-AYS, 17-cv-5529-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6031-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6032-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6033-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6555-JS-AYS, 17-cv-6556-JS-AYS, 17-cv-7085-JS-AYS, 18-cv-1998-JS-AYS, 18-cv-2006-JS-AYS, 18-cv-3588-JS, 18-cv-3304-JS-AYS, 18-cv-3484-JS-AYS and 18-cv-3486-JS-AYS (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-40): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (Florio, Lisa) (CM to pro se plaintiff) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-40): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (CM to pro se plaintiff) (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from nyed on 6/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-02788. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
|