Acosta v. Fresno Oxygen and Welding Suppliers, Inc.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00900 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 26, 2018 12:28 AM PST |
Defendant
Fresno Oxygen and Welding Suppliers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Substitution of Attorney Order
Tue 12/18 11:42 AM
CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/17/18.. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Substitution of Attorney - Proposed
Mon 12/17 10:57 AM
SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Jose Acosta. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 12/10 2:31 PM
ORDER RE Stipulated Request for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/10/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/07 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of entire action by Jose Acosta. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 11/02 5:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Non-Expert Discovery due by 7/26/2019; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/23/2019; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/6/2019; Expert Discovery due by 10/18/2019; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/6/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill (6-day estimate). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/2/2018. (Rooney, M) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 10/31 1:25 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/30/2018 with an order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel Zachary Best telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Gerald Slater telephonically present. (Rooney, M) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report
Fri 10/19 4:55 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jose Acosta. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 09/06 3:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) To accommodate the Court's calendar, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on 10/18/2018 is CONTINUED and will now be held on 10/30/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court grants telephonic appearances, with each party wishing to so appear directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. The parties are also reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the conference and email a copy of same, in Word format, to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov, for the Judge's review. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/6/2018. (Rooney, M) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/17 12:14 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Fresno Oxygen and Welding Suppliers, Inc..(Slater, Gerald) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 07/19 3:55 PM
Order re stipulation to extend time for Defendant to answer complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/2018. (Filing Deadline: 8/22/2018) (Rosales, O) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/18 12:48 PM
STIPULATION re4 Summons Returned Executed,1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Fresno Oxygen and Welding Suppliers, Inc.. Attorney Slater, Gerald Andrew added. (Slater, Gerald) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/17 3:33 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Fresno Oxygen and Welding Suppliers, Inc. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for LJO
Mon 07/02 3:34 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Mon 07/02 3:18 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fresno Oxygen and Welding Suppliers, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under The Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants by Jose Acosta. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7742238)(Best, Zachary) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |