Planned Parenthood of Arkansas, et al v. Larry Jegley, et al
Original Case: 4:15-cv-00784
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-02463 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 12, 2018 2:24 AM CST |
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Americans United for Life
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Larry Jegley, Prosecuting Attorney for Pulaski County, in his official capacity, his agents and successors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Matt Durrett, Prosecuting Attorney for Washington County, in his official capacity, his agents and successors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma, on behalf of themselves and their patients (originally named as Planned Parenthood Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma), doing business as Planned Parenthood of the Heartland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Stephanie Ho, MD, on behalf of herself and her patients
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma, on behalf of themselves and their patients (originally named as Planned Parenthood Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma), doing business as Planned Parenthood Great Plains
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/12/2018 2:24 AM CST |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
6 pgs Civil case docketed. [4680342] 18-2463 (CMH) | ||
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 7/2/2018. [4680348] 18-2463 (CMH) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/20/2018. Appendix due 08/28/2018. BRIEF APPELLANT, Matt Durrett and Larry Jegley due 08/28/2018 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4680350] 18-2463 (CMH) |