Hultgren Construction, LLC
South Dakota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Charles L Nail, Jr |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-40329 |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 05, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hultgren Construction LLC
101 S Main Ave Ste 400
Sioux Falls, SD 57104-6451 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
James L. Snyder
210 Walnut Street, Room 793
Des Moines, IA 50309 |
1. | Hultgren Construction files for Chapter 11 reorganization (ksfy.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/19/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 12:03 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
utility
Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively
Thu 03/05 8:25 AM
Bankruptcy Case Administratively Closed. (mnel) |