California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:18-cv-06472
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2018
Terminated:Oct 24, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 22, 2019 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
Kristine R. Crandall
Represented By
Alarice M Medrano
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Elvenzon Sy
Represented By
David M Sturman
Law Offices Of David M Sturman
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 10/24 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Elvenzon Sy. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
8 8 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 10/01 2:00 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kristine R. Crandall answer now due 10/31/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Kristine R. Crandall.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Kristine R. Crandall(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days) Fri 08/03 2:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elvenzon Sy, upon Defendant Kristine R. Crandall served on 8/1/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Patricia Myles. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to R. Stewart. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R. Williams. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of Service on Attorney General,
Att: 2 Supplement Proof of Service on Defendant
Friday, July 27, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/27 3:48 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kristine R. Crandall. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 07/27 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 07/26 9:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Elvenzon Sy. (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 07/26 9:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elvenzon Sy, (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 07/26 9:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Elvenzon Sy. (Sturman, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/26 9:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22157326 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Elvenzon Sy. (Attorney David M Sturman added to party Elvenzon Sy(pty:pla))(Sturman, David)
Related: [-]