City of Lincoln, Alabama v. Actavis LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45786 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 1:18-cv-00819 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:22 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Lincoln, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 4:27 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3099150, NDAL receipt #B4601089353. (Ponder, J) Modified on 5/31/2018 (JLC). [Transferred from alnd on 7/6/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |