Edison Cement Corp. v. NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10595
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10595
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Tony M Davis |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01078 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NCFD Farm Club LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NCFO Building Ltd. Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NCFO Building I Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenneth Earl Studdard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenneth Earl Studdard, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lorene Studdard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edison Cement Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 1:11 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/13 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
order
AP-Dismiss Case (PDF)
Tue 06/11 9:39 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case With Prejudice (Order entered on 6/11/2019) (Benitez, Estella) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 06/11 9:40 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Benitez, Estella) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/17 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
order
AP-Regarding Matter (PDF)
Mon 04/15 3:12 PM
Order Withdrawing (Order entered on 4/15/2019) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Mon 04/15 2:55 PM
Hearing Held: WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE Order due by 4/29/2019 (Boyd, Laurie) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
court
Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public)
Thu 04/11 9:42 AM
Order reassigning business of the court and transferring case (For Informational Purposes Only) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary)
Wed 04/03 11:11 AM
STATUS Hearing RESET FROM 4/3/19 TO 4/15/19 |
||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Wed 02/06 10:27 AM
Hearing Held: ORDER ABATING ENTERED The Hearing Judge is Judge Craig A. Gargotta (Boyd, Laurie) |
||
Sunday, February 03, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 02/03 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 02/03 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
AP-Abating (pdf)
Fri 02/01 7:13 AM
Order Abating (Order entered on 2/1/2019) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
33 | 33
order
AP-Abating (pdf)
Fri 02/01 7:11 AM
Order Abating (Order entered on 2/1/2019) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
court
Hearing (NO FORM) (Adversary)
Fri 02/01 8:25 AM
STATUS Hearing to Consider Upon the Following : |
||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/20 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/20/2018. (Admin.) |
|
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/20 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/20/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
court
Hearing (F) (Adversary)
Tue 12/18 9:27 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Hearing Scheduled For 2/6/2019 at 10:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
29 | 29
court
Hearing (F) (Adversary)
Tue 12/18 9:26 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Hearing Scheduled For 2/6/2019 at 10:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/13 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/13/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Wed 12/12 4:57 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Stephen W. Sather for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp. (Sather, Stephen). Related document(s) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
AP-Withdraw or Substitute Attorney (PDF)
Tue 12/11 4:15 PM
Order Allowing Withdrawal of Attorney (Order entered on 12/11/2018) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
Sunday, December 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 12/09 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/09/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Withdraw or Substitute Attorney (Adversary)
Fri 12/07 8:26 PM
Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed by David Junkin for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp.. (Junkin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing (F) (Adversary)
Fri 12/07 9:25 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Status Hearing Set For 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 ...COURT REQUEST THE HEARING... (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Case (Adversary)
Mon 12/03 4:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Eric J. Taube for Defendants NCFD Farm Club LLC, NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard. (Taube, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
court
Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary)
Mon 12/03 2:51 PM
Hearing CONTINUED FROM 12/3/18 TO 12/17/18 Status Hearing Set For 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT... (Lopez, Jennifer) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing (NO FORM) (Adversary)
Fri 11/30 2:17 PM
STATUS Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Status Hearing Set For 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 (Benitez, Estella) |
||
Sunday, November 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/11 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 11/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Fri 11/09 1:33 PM
Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Eric J. Taube for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp., Defendants NCFD Farm Club LLC, NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard (Taube, Eric) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing (F) (Adversary)
Fri 11/09 11:36 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Hearing Scheduled For 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 1 .....IF TIME ESTIMATE FOR BOTH SIDES EXCEEDS 30 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL THE COURTROOM DEPUTY AT JENNIFER_LOPEZ@TXWB.USCOURTS.GOV AND ALL AFFECTED PARTIES FOR A SPECIAL SETTING. (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/05 12:26 PM
Amended Complaint () filed by Stephen W. Sather for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Saturday, November 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 11/03 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 11/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
AP-Extend Time (PDF)
Thu 11/01 1:58 PM
Order Allowing Extension of Time to November 5, 2018 (Order entered on 11/1/2018) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend Time (Adversary)
Wed 10/31 4:05 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Replead, Filed by Stephen W. Sather for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp.. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Thu 10/11 7:39 AM
Hearing Held: Plaintiff to Replead within 21 Days. . (Wallace, Adam) |
||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Thu 10/11 7:39 AM
Hearing Held: Status Hearing: Notice of Removal RESOLVED. . (Wallace, Adam) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Tue 10/09 4:02 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Eric J. Taube for Defendants NCFD Farm Club LLC, NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard (Taube, Eric) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Fri 10/05 4:24 PM
Plaintiff's Designation of Witnesses and Exhibits for October 10, 2018 Hearing filed by Stephen W. Sather for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Thu 10/04 5:36 PM
Defendants' Designation of Witnesses and Exhibits for October 10, 2018 Hearing filed by Eric J. Taube for Defendants NCFD Farm Club LLC, NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard (Taube, Eric) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Fri 09/21 3:37 PM
Debtor's Joinder in Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion for Mandatory Abstention and/or Remand filed by Joseph D. Martinec for Debtor North Carolina Furniture Direct I Ltd. (Martinec, Joseph) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/20 2:07 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/21/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Wed 09/19 12:23 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Stephen W. Sather for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
8 | 8
order
AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf)
Wed 09/19 8:45 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent. (Order entered on 9/19/2018) (Boyd, Laurie) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
ans
Response (Adversary)
Tue 09/18 2:20 PM
Response Filed by Eric J. Taube for Defendants NCFD Farm Club LLC, NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard. (Taube, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Hearing (F) (Adversary)
Wed 09/12 3:36 PM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Hearing Scheduled For 10/10/2018 at 10:35 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 .....IF TIME ESTIMATE FOR BOTH SIDES EXCEEDS 30 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL THE COURTROOM DEPUTY AT JENNIFER_LOPEZ@TXWB.USCOURTS.GOV AND ALL AFFECTED PARTIES FOR A SPECIAL SETTING. (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
AP-Status Hearing (F)
Tue 09/11 6:51 AM
Order for Status Hearing Status Hearing Set For 10/10/2018 at 10:35 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 (Order entered on 9/11/2018) (Lopez, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
~Motion (Generic) (Adversary)
Mon 09/10 3:47 PM
Motion For Mandatory Abstention And/Or Remand Filed by Stephen W. Sather for Plaintiff Edison Cement Corp.. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Wed 08/22 3:57 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Joseph D. Martinec for Debtor North Carolina Furniture Direct I Ltd. (Martinec, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Thu 08/09 2:29 PM
Defendants' Supplemental Documents in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Eric J. Taube for Defendants NCFD Farm Club LLC, NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard (Taube, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 1 | ||
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 2 | ||
Att: 3 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 3 | ||
Att: 4 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 4 | ||
Att: 5 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 5 | ||
Att: 6 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 6 | ||
Att: 7 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 7 | ||
Att: 8 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 8 | ||
Att: 9 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 9 | ||
Att: 10 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit - PART 10 | ||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 08/08 4:26 PM
Adversary case 18-01078 Notice of Removal - Edison Cement Corp. against NCFD Warehouse 1 Ltd., NCFD Warehouse Ltd. Co., NCFD Farm Club LLC, North Carolina Furniture Direct Farm Club, Ltd., NCFO Building Ltd. Co., NCFO Building I Ltd., Kenneth Earl Studdard, Kenneth Earl Studdard Jr., Lorene Studdard ( Filing Fee: $ 350.00 ) (Nature(s) of Suit:(01 (Determination of removed claim or cause))). (Taube, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet from State Court Action | ||
Att: 3 State Court Filings |