EEOC v. United Airlines, Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Xavier Rodriguez |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00817 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 05, 2019 2:31 AM CST |
Defendant
United Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EEOC
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit: A United Airlines pilot repeatedly posted sexually explicit images of a United flight attendant on various websites (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/13/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
50 | 50
![]() ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re48 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) |
|
49 | 49
![]() CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
48 | 48
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jane Doe.(Walsh, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |