Chamberlain v. Tesla, Inc., et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-04876 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 06, 2019 12:32 AM PST |
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elon Musk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Chamberlain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FNY Investment Advisers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | Elon Musk and Tesla sued over 'fraudulent scheme' to go private (theguardian.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/13/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) | |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |