Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James M Carr
Case #: 1:18-ap-50234
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2018
Terminated:Jan 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Off Duty Officers Inc.
2365 La Mirada Drive
Vista, CA 92081
Represented By
Off Duty Officers Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Cassandra A. Nielsen
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, March 15, 2019
14 14 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 03/15 11:01 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso Related [+]. (Nielsen, Cassandra)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC) Wed 02/06 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291112. (TW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
13 13 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/25 1:00 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50234] Closed. (lak)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Sat 01/12 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 01/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
11 11 court Minute Entry/Order Thu 01/10 8:36 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/09/2019, MATTER: Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant7 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (303344)). (HeatherMButler)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Wed 01/09 3:14 PM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Off Duty Officers Inc Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak)
Related: [-] 7
Saturday, December 22, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Service - Official Court Notice Sun 12/23 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - OFFICIAL COURT NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 12/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, December 20, 2018
8 8 court Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc. Thu 12/20 9:17 AM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/9/2019 at 01:30 PM EST in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. (hmb)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
7 7 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Tue 12/18 12:49 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 12/17 3:33 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Off Duty Officers Inc Related [+]. (lak)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of Mon 12/17 11:48 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk with Affidavit filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Mon 08/20 11:09 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Off Duty Officers Inc Related [+]. (Nielsen, Cassandra)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, August 13, 2018
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 08/13 4:09 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 08/27/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 9/12/2018. (lak)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 08/13 2:32 PM
Appearance filed by Cassandra A. Nielsen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Nielsen, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/13 2:29 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50234 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Off Duty Officers Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 Related [+]], [13]. (Nielsen, Cassandra)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer