New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:18-cv-07586
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2018
Terminated:Feb 05, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Feb 16, 2019 4:08 AM EST
Defendant
Paul Raquel LLC
Represented By
Domenick Napoletano
Domenick Napoletano
contact info
Defendant
Riomar Corp
Represented By
Brian Gregory Klein
Franklin Gringer & Cohen, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Namel Norris
Represented By
Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
The Weitz Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Robert Jonas Mirel
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
34 34 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 03/19 10:03 AM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: COME NOW, Plaintiff, NAMEL NORRIS, and Defendants, RIOMAR CORP., A New York corporation, d/b/a KANAS TAPAS BAR RESTAURANT, and PAUL RAQUEL LLC, a New York limited liability company, a New York corporation, by and through their respective undersigned counsel, and pursuant to a confidential settlement agreement and pursuant to the provisions of Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby stipulated to a dismissal of the above-captioned action, with prejudice, with regard to all Defendants. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Paul Raquel LLC (a New York limited liability company) and Riomar Corp (a New York corporation) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/18/2019) (anc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
33 33 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 03/18 3:54 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
32 32 2 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Tue 02/05 1:16 PM
ORDER: By letter dated February 4, 2019, the parties have informed the Court that this case has settled. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action be conditionally discontinued without prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal. Otherwise, within such time Plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the active calendar of this Court in the event that the settlement is not consummated. Upon such application for reinstatement, the parties shall continue to be subject to the Court's jurisdiction, the Court shall promptly reinstate the action to its active docket, and the parties shall be directed to appear before the Court, without the necessity of additional process, on a date within ten (10) days of the application, to schedule remaining pretrial proceedings and/or dispositive motions, as appropriate. This Order shall be deemed a final discontinuance of the action with prejudice in the event that Plaintiff has not requested restoration of the case to the active calendar within such 30-day period. The Court has not retained jurisdiction to enforce any settlement agreement. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/5/2019) (mro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
31 31 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 02/04 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Namel Norris. (Mirel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
30 30 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/28 4:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Riomar Corp.(Klein, Brian)
Related: [-]
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/28 4:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Riomar Corp.(Klein, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/27 4:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Raquel LLC.(Napoletano, Domenick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/15 1:32 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted in part and denied in part. Neither defendant has answered or otherwise responded to the complaint within the 21 day period prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). However, as Plaintiff has indicated that they do not intend to move for an order to show cause for default judgment, the Court extends the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to November 28, 2018. Dkt. No. 19. The initial pre-trial conference took place on November 8, 2018 and the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order has already been docketed. Dkt. No. 24. Accordingly, the request to adjourn those deadlines is denied. In the event that defendant Paul Rachel LLC moves to modify any deadline set by the scheduling order, the Court expects they will do so by December 3, 2018. Any such motion must include the reason for any requested modification, and the position of all parties on that modification. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/3/2018.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/15/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11/15 1:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Paul Raquel LLC answer due 11/28/2018; Riomar Corp answer due 11/28/2018. (anc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
26 26 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/14 4:51 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Domenick Napoletano dated November 14 2018. Document filed by Paul Raquel LLC.(Napoletano, Domenick)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/14 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Domenick Napoletano on behalf of Paul Raquel LLC. (Napoletano, Domenick)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/13 7:48 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Motions for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed no later than 5/22/2019. Deposition pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 2/6/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2019. Expert Discovery due by 4/22/2019. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 days. Status Conference set for 5/16/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/9/2018) (mro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/08 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Gregory Klein on behalf of Riomar Corp. (Klein, Brian)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 11/09 9:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2018. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Daniels, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/08 7:32 AM
ORDER: denying20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel for defendant requests the following adjournments or extensions of time:(i) a three-week extension of time from today's date to submit a response to the Complaint; (ii) a four-week extension of the time from today's date to submit a Proposed Civil case Management Plan and Scheduling Order; and (iii) a thirty-day adjournment of the initial pretrial conference, or any date thereafter which is more convenient for Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. The Court expects to discuss these issues at the initial pretrial conference on November 8, 2018. Counsel for Defendant Riomar is directed to file a notice of appearance prior to that conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/7/2018) (js)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/07 9:52 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Brian G. Klein dated November 7, 2018. Document filed by Riomar Corp.(Klein, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
20 20 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/06 7:33 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Brian G. Klein dated November 6, 2018. Document filed by Riomar Corp.(Klein, Brian)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Initial Report of Parties Before Pretrial Conference Tue 11/06 5:20 PM
INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. - AMENDED Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Case Management Plan
Monday, November 05, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/06 6:51 AM
ORDER: On October 24, 2018 the Court directed Plaintiff to submit the documents described in the Court's September 27, 2018 order no later than November 3, 2018. Dkt. No. 16. On November 2, 2018 Plaintiff submitted a proposed case management plan and letter which relate to a different case. Dkt. No. 17. Plaintiff is directed to submit the documents described in the Court's September 27, 2018 order forthwith, and in no event later than November 7, 2018 at 2 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/5/2018) (mro)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
17 17 misc Initial Report of Parties Before Pretrial Conference Fri 11/02 6:27 PM
INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Case Management Plan
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 10/24 12:38 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 29, 2018 is adjourned to November 8, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. The documents described in the Courts September 27, 2018 order must be submitted no later than November 3, 2018. The Court notes that Defendants were served the complaint on September 27, 2018. Dkt. Nos. 10, 11. If Plaintiff intends to move for an order to show cause for default judgment in this case, the Court expects Plaintiff to do so by November 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/24/2018) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 10/23 9:13 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated October 23, 2018. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/23 1:41 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to submit the documents described in the Courts September 27, 2018 order forthwith, and in no event later than October 25, 2018. If Defendants are not responsive, Plaintiff may submit those documents without Defendants input. In that event, the Court expects Plaintiffs status letter would indicate 1) the methods by, and occasions on, which Plaintiff has attempted to contact Defendants and 2) whether, and by what date, Plaintiff intends to move for an order to show cause for a default judgement. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/23/2018) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 10/09 11:26 AM
ORDER granting in part12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 10, 2018 is adjourned to October 29, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on Defendants and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/9/2018) (ne)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
12 12 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 10/05 4:12 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated October 5, 2018. Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 10/05 3:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Paul Raquel LLC served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 10/05 3:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Riomar Corp served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/04 10:27 AM
ORDER: On September 27, 2018, the Court set an initial pretrial conference for October 10, 2018 at 4:20 p.m. Dkt. No. 8. In that order, the Court directed the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan no later than October 3, 2018. The Court has received neither document. The parties are ordered to comply with the Court's September 27, 2018 order forthwith, and in no event later than October 5, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/4/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 09/28 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENTPLAN: October 3, 2018, and as further set forth in this order. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 04:20 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/27/2018) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 09/25 8:16 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 08/21 2:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Riomar Corp. (jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/21 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Raquel LLC. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 08/21 9:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 08/21 9:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 08/21 9:55 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/20 6:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Jonas Mirel on behalf of Namel Norris. (Mirel, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/20 6:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Raquel LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/20 6:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Riomar Corp, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Namel Norris. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/20 6:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/20 6:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Paul Raquel LLC, Riomar Corp. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15473744)Document filed by Namel Norris.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]