Shelby County, TN v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45992 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Western, 2:18-cv-02528 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:30 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
|
|
Plaintiff
Shelby County, TN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:43 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 8/21/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 8/21/2018.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 8/21/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint filed by Shelby County has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Summons need to be filed as individual documents. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) [Transferred from tnwd on 8/21/2018.] | |
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
![]() |