California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:18-cv-02389
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2018
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 26, 2019 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
American Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By
Jason Loren Hoffman
Real Estate Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
California Fruit Building, LLC
Represented By
Jason Loren Hoffman
Real Estate Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sundeep S. Dale
Represented By
Jason Loren Hoffman
Real Estate Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dale Investments, LLC
Represented By
Jason Loren Hoffman
Real Estate Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rohit Ranchhod
Represented By
Jason Loren Hoffman
Real Estate Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sundeep Dale, LLC
Represented By
Jason Loren Hoffman
Real Estate Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AFC Realty Capital, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Wilke Fleury Hoffelt Gould And Birney LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 09 2019
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/8/2019 GRANTING 10 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Not later than 20 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Plaintiff may (but is not required to) file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is timely filed, all causes of action dismissed by virtue of this Memorandum and Order will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the parties. (Huang, H)
GPO Aug 21 2019
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/20/2019 EXTENDING Time up to and including 9/3/2019, for Defendants to Respond to the 16 First Amended Complaint. (York, M)
GPO Jan 27 2020
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/27/2020 MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery shall be completed no later than 365 days after the filing of 16 First Amended Complaint; All counsel shall designate and serve an Expert Witness Disclosure not later than 60 days after the close of discovery and any party may serve a supplemental expert witness discovery within 30 days after the designation of experts; Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than 180 days after the close of non-expert discovery; and the parties shall file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving the Court's ruling on the last filed dispositive motion. (Huang, H)
GPO Jun 03 2020
SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/2/2020 CONTINUING the deadline for percipient witness discovery from 4/15/2020 to 10/16/2020. Any expert witness disclosures shall be served not later than 60 days after the close of percipient witness discovery, and any party may serve supplemental disclosures (consistent with the substantive limitations imposed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure) within 30 days after initial expert disclosures. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 60 days after the close of non-expert discovery. The parties shall file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling on the last-filed dispositive motion. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Oct 13 2020
a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling on the last-filed dispositive motion. (Huang, H)THIRD STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/13/2020 CONTINUING the deadline for percipient witness discovery to 12/16/2021. Any expert witness disclosures shall be served not later than 60 days after the close of percipient witness discovery, and any party may serve supplemental disclosures within 30 days after initial expert disclosures. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 60 days after the close of non-expert discovery. The parties shall file
GPO Jul 23 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/22/2021 APPROVING the parties' stipulation, to elicit testimony and documents from Farm Credit West. 48.(Becknal, R)
GPO Aug 13 2021
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/12/21 ORDERING that Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be filed and served not later than 9/3/21. The Defendants' reply to Plaintiff's opposition be filed and served no later than 9/13/21.
GPO Aug 17 2021
rd Stipulation and Order to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order, however, shall remain in effect. (Huang, H)ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/16/2021 GRANTING 38 Motion to the extent that the new deadline for completing percipient witness discovery shall be shortened to 10/15/2021. The remaining provisions contained in 37 Thi
GPO Jun 17 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/16/22 DENYING 50 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is entitled to the $365,474.00 it requests, calculated pursuant to the formula provided by the subject Agreement, plus statutory interest from the date of breach. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Oct 17 2022
JUDGMENT dated *10/15/2022* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/15/2022 ORDERING Plaintiff Recover the sum of $365,474.00 from the Defendants; Recover prejudgment interest at the statutory interest rate of 10% from the date of breach on 08/23/2017, through the entry of judgment, in the total sum of $553,417.76, including the principal amount and interest; Recover costs of suit; and This judgment bears interest at the judgment rate of 2.79% per annum until satisfied. (Rodriguez, E)
GPO Dec 15 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/14/2022 STAYING 78 Judgment and 80 Costs Taxed upon the deposit of security with the Court and Order. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Dec 15 2022
AMENDED 88 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/14/2022 DIRECTING the Defendants funds to remain in the Court's Deposit Fund until further order of the court. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Oct 04 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/3/2023 GRANTING 93 Motion to Correct the Record. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO May 13 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 05/13/2024 AUTHORIZING the Clerk to Disburse the remaining Funds totaling $120,140.77 to the defendants. (cc Financial) (Murphy, J)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 13, 2024
100 100 order Stipulation and Order Mon 05/13 11:21 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 05/13/2024 AUTHORIZING the Clerk to Disburse the remaining Funds totaling $120,140.77 to the defendants. (cc Financial) (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
99 99 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 05/07 5:17 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Disbursement of Funds on Deposit with Court by American Hospitality Services, Inc., California Fruit Building, LLC, Sundeep S. Dale, Dale Investments, LLC, Rohit Ranchhod, Sundeep Dale, LLC. (Roussos, Carmenella)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
98 98 appeal USCA Order/Mandate/Memo Tue 05/07 4:02 PM
USCA MANDATE AFFIRMING The decision of the District Court as to81 Notice of Appeal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]