Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David E Rice
Case #: 1:18-bk-21681
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2018
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Jazpal, LLC
1827 Mountain Rd
Joppa, MD 21085-1918
Represented By
David W. Cohen
Law Office Of David W. Cohen
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Baltimore
Garmatz Federal Courthouse 101 West Lombard Street Suite 2625
Baltimore, MD 21201


1. Mountain Branch Golf Course owner files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (baltimoresun.com)
Submitted Fri 10/12/2018
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, March 04, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 03/04 7:09 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Maloney-Raymond, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 03, 2024
209 209 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Mon 03/04 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 208 Order Vacating Order
Friday, March 01, 2024
208 208 order Vacating Order Fri 03/01 7:34 AM
Order Vacating Final Decree Improvidently Entered. Bankruptcy Chapter 11 Case Reopened. Related [+]. (Maloney-Raymond, Michelle)
Related: [-] 207 Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case