City of Olympia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46021 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Washington Western, 3:18-cv-05560 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:33 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathon D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Advantage Logistics
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Olympia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:45 PM EDT |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.] | ||
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re2 Notice of Related Case. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.] | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |