Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-46040
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2018
Case in other court:New Hampshire, 1:18-cv-00721
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:34 PM EST
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Ride Aid of Maryland Inc
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904
Plaintiff
City of Berlin, NH
Represented By
Joseph L. Ciaccio
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
Hunter J. Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik
contact info
Salvatore C. Badala
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
David P. Slawsky
Nixon Vogelman Barry Slawsky & Simoneau
contact info
Shayna Erin Sacks
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:42 PM EDT
Friday, August 17, 2018
Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-721-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NEW CASE/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1698653 filed by City of Berlin.(Slawsky, David) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Notices and Waivers
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Ride-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF
3 3 MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the complaint sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 10/22/2018. (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Public Docket Sheet
Monday, August 27, 2018
4 4 ORDER MDL No. 1 re: conditional transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Order is not effective until filed in the transferee court. MDL No. 2804. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/26/2018. (ko) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
Civil Case Terminated. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER MDL FINAL ORDER case is transferred to Northern District of Ohio for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Hampshire. Case number 1:18-cv-00721. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]