Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-46036
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2018
Case in other court:Texas Western, 2:18-cv-00052
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:34 PM EST
3rd Party Plaintiff
Miami-Luken, Inc.
3rd Party Plaintiff
Stuart D. Baker
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
119 E. Court Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Plaintiff
County of Zavala
Represented By
Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
contact info
Hunter J. Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:02 PM EDT
Thursday, August 09, 2018
Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jaw) [Transferred from txwd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (jaw) [Transferred from txwd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11102713). No Summons requested at this time, filed by The County of Zavala.(Vera, Luis) [Transferred from txwd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
2 2 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (jaw) [Transferred from txwd on 9/5/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
3 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Western. Case number 2:18-cv-00052. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]