Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-12012

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-12017
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Empire Productions LLC
2049 Century Park E Fl 4
Los Angeles, CA 90067-3101
Represented By
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
6 6 claims Certification of No Claims Activity Wed 12/26 2:00 PM
Certification of No Claims Activity . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 10/23 9:28 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Empire Productions LLC. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs
Friday, September 07, 2018
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 09/07 10:49 AM
Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only [An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Open Road Films, LLC, Open Road Releasing, LLC, or Productions LLC, Briarcliff LLC, Open Road International LLC, and Empire Productions, LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Open Road Films, LLC, Case No. 18-12012 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case ] Signed on 9/7/2018 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
3 3 court Case Reassigned Thu 09/06 8:55 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (LB)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/06 8:27 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-12017 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9003209, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 09/06 5:09 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Empire Productions LLC. (Nestor, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 09/06 7:45 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (LB)
Related: [-]