Konig v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46041 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 0:18-cv-61960 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:35 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Konig
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/01/2019 12:24 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail) [Transferred from flsd on 9/6/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (ail) [Transferred from flsd on 9/6/2018.] | |
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
Civil Case Terminated per DE5 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 9/6/2018.] | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |