Adams County et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46062 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Idaho, 1:18-cv-00360 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:36 PM EST |
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Albertsons LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Auburn Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Henry Schein, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smith's Food & Drug, Inc. d/b/a Peyton's Phoenix
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
Caribou County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Payette County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonneville County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Boise County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blaine County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Owyhee County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latah County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cassia County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adams County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minidoka County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elmore County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
Terminated: 01/22/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:02 PM EDT |
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |