Vernon Unsworth v. Elon Musk
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-08048 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2019 3:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Elon Musk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Unsworth
|
Represented By
|
1. | Elon Musk's defense against diver's lawsuit: 'Pedo guy' just means 'creepy old man' (mashable.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/17/2019 | |
2. | Elon Musk Heading Back To Federal Court, This Time For 'Pedo' Tweet (forbes.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/13/2019 | |
3. | Elon Musk sued by British cave diver for defamation (nbcnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/18/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
171 | 171 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings December 3, 2019 re Transcript170 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Elias, Laura) TEXT ONLY ENTRY | |
170 | 170
![]() PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on December 3, 2019. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2021. (Elias, Laura) |
|
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 07/28 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings December 3, 2019 re Transcript170 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Elias, Laura) |