Madisonville Town v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46063 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:18-cv-07974 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:36 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WALGREEN CO.
200 WILMOT ROAD
DEERFIELD, IL 60015 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Madisonville Town
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 9/17/2018.] | |
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |