Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:18-cr-01734
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2018
Last checked: Friday Sep 28, 2018 12:34 AM MST
Defendant
Julian David Hernandez-Sierra (1)
Represented By
Michael John Martinez Areinoff
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Defendant
Panfilo Irobel Perez-Barraza (2)
Represented By
Adam Netel Bleier
Sherick & Bleier PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew G Eltringham
Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/28/2018 1:39 AM MST
Thursday, August 02, 2018
Arrest of Julian David Hernandez-Sierra on 8/2/2018. (ADI-DPS, ) [4:18-mj-01831-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Julian David Hernandez-Sierra. (ADI-DPS, ) [4:18-mj-01831-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance Without Counsel as to Julian David Hernandez-Sierra held on 8/3/2018. Defendant state true name to be the same. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required for Julian David Hernandez-Sierra (1). Appearances : AUSA Jon Granoff(duty) for the Government. Defendant is present and in custody Related [+]. Spanish Interpreter Juan Radillo assists defendant. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 8/7/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman. Hearing held 02:10 pm to 02:37 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ABU) [4:18-mj-01831-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] straint level 0corded by COURTSMART.
3 3 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney Michael John Martinez Areinoff (FPD) for Julian David Hernandez-Sierra. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC) [4:18-mj-01831-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leslie A. Bowman: Detention Hearing as to Julian David Hernandez-Sierra held on August 7, 2018. Defendant is ordered detained pending Trial. The Preliminary Hearing is waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Magistrate case referral is Judge Kimmins. Assigning attorney Matthew G. Eltringham for USA. Appearances : AUSA, Liza Granoff on behalf of Matthew Eltringham for the Government; AFPD, Elena Kay on behalf of Michael Areinoff for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody Related [+]. Spanish Interpreter Juan Carlos Cordova assists the Defendant. Hearing held 10:33 a.m. to 11:07 a.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:18-mj-01831-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] straint level 0corded by COURTSMART.
Thursday, August 09, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Pafilo Irubel Perez-Barraza (1). (KAH) [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew Eltringham appearing for USA. (KAH) [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Julian David Hernandez-Sierra. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A. Bowman on August 7, 2018.(CXE) [4:18-mj-01831-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/13/2018 as to Pafilo Irubel Perez-Barraza. (ALS) [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau: Initial Appearance Without Counsel as to Pafilo Irubel Perez-Barraza held on 8/13/2018. Defendant states TRUE NAME to be Panfilo Irubel Perez-Barraza. Further proceedings ordered in defendant's true name. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant is temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish interpreter required for defendant. Appearances : AUSA Matthew Eltringham for the Government. Defendant is present and in custody Related [+]. Spanish Interpreter Carlos Arvizu assists defendant. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 8/15/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Hearing held 2:23 PM to 3:09 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ALS) [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] straint level 5 - for the purpose of this hearingcorded by COURTSMART.
6 6 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney Adam Netel Bleier (CJA) for Panfilo Irubel Perez-Barraza. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC) [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. Rateau: Detention Hearing as to Panfilo Irubel Perez-Barraza held on August 15, 2018. The Defendant states his TRUE NAME to be Panfilo Irobel Perez-Barraza. Further proceedings are ordered in the Defendant's true name. The Defendant is ordered detained pending Trial. The Preliminary Hearing is waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Magistrate case referral is Judge Kimmins. Appearances : AUSA, Matthew Eltringham for the Government; CJA Attorney, Adam Bleier for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody Related [+]. Spanish Interpreter Juan Carlos Cordova assists the Defendant. Hearing held 10:55 a.m. to 11:21 a.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] straint level 0corded by COURTSMART.
Friday, August 17, 2018
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Panfilo Irobel Perez-Barraza. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. Rateau on August 15, 2018.(CXE) Modified to correct Defendant's name in docket text on 8/28/2018 (CXE). [4:18-mj-00563-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
10 10 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Julian David Hernandez-Sierra (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Panfilo Irobel Perez-Barraza (2) count(s) 1, 5. Counsel is advised as to Arraignment set for 9/14/2018 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Macdonald, Trial date is 10/23/2018 at 9:30 a.m. and Plea Deadline is 10/5/2018. NOTE: Notice of Intent to Waive Defendant's Presence at Arraignment shall be filed no later than Tuesday prior to arraignment. (KEP)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
12 12 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Julian David Hernandez-Sierra, Panfilo Irobel Perez-Barraza. (ADI-MFR, )
Related: [-]