Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-46112
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2018
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:18-cv-02612
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:41 PM EST
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Defendant
SpecGx, LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse # 45
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Bartlit Beck - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
Defendant
Jonathan Sackler
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
Defendant
Richard Sackler
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Defendant
Actavis Kadian, LLC
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904
Defendant
Advantage Logistics
Represented By
Gretchen N. Miller
Greenberg Traurig - Chicago
contact info
Francis A. Citera
Greenberg Traurig - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Defendant
Allergan, Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Jane Does
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Keiko L. Sugisaka
Maslon
contact info
Thomas R. Pack
Maslon
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Keiko L. Sugisaka
Maslon
contact info
Thomas R. Pack
Maslon
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
Plaintiff
Dakota County
Represented By
Scott A. Benson
Briol & Associates
contact info
Linda J. Singer
Motley Rice - Washington
contact info
Mark J. Briol
Briol & Benson
contact info
Jay R. Stassen
Office Of Prosecuting Attorney
contact info
James C. Backstrom
Office Of Prosecuting Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:12 PM EDT
Thursday, September 06, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County, case number 19HA-CV 18-3648 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6354369) Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc. No summons requested.. (Sugisaka, Keiko) Modified text/filers on 9/7/2018 (lmb). [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - civil cover sheet, Summons and complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - state court documents,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Endo International plc is a corporate parent of Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sugisaka, Keiko) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
3 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Linda Singer; Elizabeth Smith; Sara Aguiniga; Ingo W. Sprie, Jr., Sean Morris, Mark S. Cheffo; Hayden A. Coleman; Steven A. Reed; Brian M. Ercole; Charles C. Lifland as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2612 (DSD/HB). (lmb) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
6 6 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Dakota County, Minnesota. (Sugisaka, Keiko) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
7 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Stipulation,,. (Sugisaka, Keiko) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER on6 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint: Defendants shall have through and including 45 days after the later of (1) a ruling on any motion to remand Plaintiff may file or (2) the JPML's determination regarding transfer, to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/13/2018. (JMK) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
9 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-56) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 10/1/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
10 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:18-cv-02612. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]