Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James J Tancredi
Case #: 2:18-bk-21636
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Nov 05, 2018
Claims Deadline:Feb 04, 2019
Dismissed:Oct 23, 2018
Terminated:Dec 18, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Sarah's Coffee House, Inc.
PO Box 4070
Hartford, CT 06147-4070
Represented By
Antonio Del Mastro
The Law Offices Of Antonio Del Mastro
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510


1. Downtown Hartford's Sarah's Coffee House files Ch. 11 bankruptcy (hartfordbusiness.com)
Submitted Thu 10/04/2018
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/18 3:09 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Tassmer, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/26 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/25/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
22 22 order Dismiss Case Tue 10/23 3:30 PM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Debtor's Case Related [+] . (Watson, Lisa)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, October 18, 2018
21 21 audio Digital Audio Recording Thu 10/18 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/18/2018 1:47:08 PM ]. File Size [ 11377 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:31:36 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
20 20 audio Digital Audio Recording Thu 10/18 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/18/2018 12:30:39 PM ]. File Size [ 17678 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:49:06 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Thu 10/18 5:12 PM
Hearing Held. Matter under advisement Related [+]. (Watson, Lisa)
Related: [-] 6 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference, 12 Motion to Convert Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 filed by U.S. Trustee U. S. Trustee, Motion to Dismiss Case
Monday, October 15, 2018
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/15 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Steven E. Mackey on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, Related [+]. (Mackey, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Convert Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 filed by U.S. Trustee U. S. Trustee, Motion to Dismiss Case, 14 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, Order on Motion To Limit Notice
Saturday, October 13, 2018
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/14 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
Friday, October 12, 2018
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/13 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 10/12 1:36 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certification Filed by Raymond C. Bliss on behalf of The Hotel Royal Limited Liability Company Creditor, . (Bliss, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
15 15 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 10/11 9:54 AM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Antonio Del Mastro on behalf of Sarah's Coffee House, Inc. Debtor, . (Del Mastro, Antonio)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Expedite Hearing Thu 10/11 9:31 AM
Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing, Granting Motion To Limit Notice Related [+] Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 Filed by Steven E. Mackey on behalf of U.S. Trustee. Hearing to be held on 10/18/2018 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (VanKruiningen, Karen)
Related: [-] 13 12 Motion to Convert Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 filed by U. S. Trustee
13 13 motion Expedite Hearing Thu 10/11 8:34 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Steven E. Mackey on behalf of U. S. Trustee, U.S. Trustee, in addition to Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Steven E. Mackey on behalf of U. S. Trustee, U.S. Trustee Related [+] (Mackey, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Convert Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 filed by U.S. Trustee U. S. Trustee, Motion to Dismiss Case
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Convert Chapter 11 to 7 Thu 10/11 8:31 AM
Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 Fee Amount $15. Fee Deferred. Filed by Steven E. Mackey on behalf of U. S. Trustee, U.S. Trustee, or in the alternative Motion to Dismiss Case For Failure to Provide Proof of Adequate and Appropriate Insurance Coverages, Failure to Timely File Required Bankruptcy Documents, and Failure to Timely Provide Information and Documents Reasonably Requested by the United States Trustee Filed by Steven E. Mackey on behalf of U. S. Trustee, U.S. Trustee. (Mackey, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
11 11 order Exempt From Electronic Filing Wed 10/10 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing through and including October 13, 2018. Related [+] . (VanKruiningen, Karen)
Related: [-] 2
Saturday, October 06, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/07 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference
Thursday, October 04, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 10/05 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/04/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of Creditors
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/05 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/04/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal
7 7 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Thu 10/04 3:53 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Antonio Del Mastro on behalf of Sarah's Coffee House, Inc. Debtor, Related [+]. (Del Mastro, Antonio)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sarah's Coffee House, Inc.
6 6 order Chapter 11 Case Management Conference Thu 10/04 12:49 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference. Hearing to be held on 10/18/2018 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (VanKruiningen, Karen)
Related: [-]
court Filing Fee Paid in Full Thu 10/04 7:00 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee - Chapter 11 - $1717.00, Receipt Number 279809 by KT. (cashreg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Tue 10/02 4:23 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/5/2018 at 03:00 PM at Office of the UST. Proofs of Claims due by 2/4/2019. (Steady, Theresa)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal Tue 10/02 4:00 PM
Deficiency Notice and Notice of Dismissal of Case for Failure to Cure Deficiency. (Steady, Theresa)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 10/02 3:54 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Antonio Del Mastro on behalf of Sarah's Coffee House, Inc. Debtor, . (Steady, Theresa)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Exempt From Electronic Filing Tue 10/02 3:52 PM
Motion for Exemption from Electronic Filing Filed by Antonio Del Mastro on behalf of Sarah's Coffee House, Inc., Debtor. (Steady, Theresa)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 10/02 3:38 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717. Fee Paid Over the Counter. Atty Disclosure Statement Re: 2016(b), List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Resolution Incomplete Filings due by 10/16/2018. Filed by Sarah's Coffee House, Inc. (Steady, Theresa)
Related: [-]