American Chemical Society et al v. ResearchGate GmbH
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-03019 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement (definitions) |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2019 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
ResearchGate GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Chemical Society
1155 16th Street NW
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsevier B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsevier Inc.
230 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10169 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsevier Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/11/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
1. | Publishers accuse ResearchGate of mass copyright infringement (insidehighered.com) |
Submitted Thu 10/11/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
127 | 127
![]() FINAL ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/15/2023. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
126 | 126
![]() Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction Joint Motion for Entry of Final Order and Permanent Injunction by American Chemical Society, Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Elsevier Ltd.(Zebrak, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/12 3:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting124 Motion for Limited Extension until October 11, 2023, at which time the Parties shall provide the Court with a status update, including the progress as to any settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/12/2023. (vals, Chambers) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
124 | 124
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Status Report and Joint Request for Limited Extension of Discovery Abeyance by American Chemical Society, Elsevier B.V., Elsevier Inc., Elsevier Ltd.(Zebrak, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |