Woodmont Petroleum Products, Inc.
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Joseph N Callaway |
Case #: | 5:18-bk-04876 |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Creditor Meeting: | Nov 06, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Dismissed: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2019 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Woodmont Petroleum Products, Inc.
PO Box 190
Middleburg, NC 27556-0190 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
53 | 53
order
Order Closing Case (Ch. 7/11/12 Text)
Wed 05/15 2:29 PM
Order Closing Case. SO ORDERED by s/U. S. Bankruptcy Judge. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. . (parker, roxanne) |