New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sandra J Feuerstein
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:18-cv-05561
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2018
Terminated:Jun 24, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2019 5:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Marco A. Muniz
Represented By
Jeffrey Howard Ruzal
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
contact info
Brett Thomas Perala
Rosenberg & Giger P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Concetta Graziosi
Represented By
John Jacob Rosenberg
Rosenberg & Giger P.C.
contact info
Jonathan Bell
Bell Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Darryn G Solotoff
Bell Law Group, PLLC
contact info


1. Marc Anthony settles $500K lawsuit with ex-housekeeper (pagesix.com)
Submitted Mon 06/24/2019
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, June 24, 2019
order Order on Motion for Settlement Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/24 11:37 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Settlement; ORDER DISMISSING CASE: : In accordance with Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), the Court has thoroughly reviewed the parties' Settlement Agreement and finds that it is fair and reasonable, and that the fee allocated to counsel is likewise fair and reasonable. Therefore, the Settlement Agreement is hereby approved and the case dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/24/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
15 15 26 pgs motion Settlement Fri 06/21 4:15 PM
Letter MOTION for Settlement approval by Concetta Graziosi. (Solotoff, Darryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 06/14 11:21 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File: (1) The parties shall have until June 24, 2019 file their Cheeks motion, settlement agreement, and proposed stipulation of dismissal for the Court's consideration; and (2) the June 20, 2019 Cheeks hearing is adjourned to July 2, 2019 at 11:15 a.m. (in-person, Courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip Federal Courthouse). NO further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/14/2019. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
14 14 motion Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Document Thu 06/13 5:41 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference regarding Cheeks motion , Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cheeks motion, settlement agreement and proposed stipulation of dismissal by Marco A. Muniz. (Perala, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
order Scheduling Order Tue 05/28 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re Report of Mediation(Settled): By no later than June 14, 2019 , the parties are to file their Cheeks motion, settlement agreement, and proposed stipulation of dismissal for the Court's consideration. The currently scheduled June 3 2019 Initial Conference is converted to a hearing on said motion and adjourned to June 20, 2019 at 11:15 a.m. (in-person, Courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip Federal Courthouse), unless an order granting the Cheeks motion and approving the settlement agreement is entered beforehand. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/28/2019.c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 05/08 5:41 PM
REPORT of Mediation Settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 5/22/2019. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/01 12:42 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: The application is granted. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 3/1/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/28 4:47 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery directed in the FLSA Mediation Referral Order by Marco A. Muniz. (Perala, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/16 11:29 AM
ORDER: Telephone Conference set for today, 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and contact the Court with all parties on the line. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/16/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/15 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Darryn G Solotoff on behalf of Concetta Graziosi (aty to be noticed) (Solotoff, Darryn)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/15 7:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Howard Ruzal on behalf of Marco A. Muniz (aty to be noticed) (Ruzal, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 01/14 10:45 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation - Mediation shall be completed no later than 5/6/2019; the initial conference scheduled for 2/5/2019 is adjourned to 6/3/2019. See attached order for further deadlines and instructions. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/14/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Mon 01/14 2:03 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Related [+]
Related: [-] y, Julissa
Friday, January 11, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/11 8:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Marco A. Muniz. (Perala, Brett)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Fri 01/11 3:07 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Mr. Rosenberg's application to correct his notice of appearance on the docket to reflect that he represents the Defendant, is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the docket forthwith. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/11/2019. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
8 8 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Thu 01/10 4:48 PM
Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement6 Notice of Appearance of John J. Rosenberg by Marco A. Muniz. (Perala, Brett)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/10 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of Marco A. Muniz (aty to be noticed) (Perala, Brett)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/10 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of Concetta Graziosi (aty to be noticed) (Rosenberg, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 06, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Sat 10/06 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Marco A. Muniz. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/05 10:57 AM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Concetta Graziosi (Bell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/05 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 10/04 4:19 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 10/04 4:07 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/04 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT Concetta Graziosi against Marco A. Muniz Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Concetta Graziosi. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 10/04 3:53 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 0207-10777888 (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Thu 10/04 3:57 PM
Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Defendant MARCO A MUNIZ and added Marco A. Muniz to the case to conform to the Complaint. In addition, the Main Document in Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons) was filed as one document. Documents were separated and re-entered as the Main Document and attachments in Document Entry No. 1. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Thu 10/04 4:05 PM
Proposed summons is rejected; the section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on Plaintiff or Plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not been completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/04 4:18 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]