Montauk Transit LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:18-bk-76176
Lead case is: 8:18-bk-76176
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Louis A Scarcella |
Case #: | 8:18-bk-76716 |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Montauk Transit LLC
3601 Horseblock Rd
Medford, NY 11763-2207 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 03/15 10:01 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (dhc) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Final Decree Ch 11
Tue 03/14 2:09 PM
Final Decree Chapter 11. The Clerk of the Court shall enter this Order and Final Decree on the Debtors chapter 11 case docket and on the 15th day after the entry of this Order and Final Decree, the docket shall be marked as Closed. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over the adversary proceeding Orange County Transit, LLC, as successor-in-interest to East End Bus Lines, Inc. v. Board of Education of Valley Central School District (Adv. Proc. No. 20-08148 , which shall remain open notwithstanding the Final Decree being entered in the above-captioned bankruptcy case. Signed on 2/22/2023 (dhc) |
|
Monday, August 02, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Tue 08/03 12:04 PM
Letter regarding Creditor Filed by Angela Dean (ylr) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/19 3:32 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Scott H. Bernstein, Esq. and Blakeley LLP from 805 Third Ave, 8th Floor, New York, New York 10022 to 311 West 43rd St., 12th Floor, New York, New York 10036. Filed by Scott H Bernstein on behalf of TCJ II, LLC (Bernstein, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Fri 03/01 9:20 AM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Marc Pergament, Clifford Katz, Erin Schaefer, Steven Taitz, Michael Caruso, Matthew Kye, Peter Foster, Scott Bernstein, Al Dimino, Lewis Siegel, Sara Temes, Daniel Gilbert. MOTION WITHDRAWN, SO ORDERED BY s/Louis Scarcella.. (This is a text Order, no Document is attached) (dcorsini) |
||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP)
Thu 01/10 1:09 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Marc Pergament, Clifford Katz, Lewis Siegel, David Sklar, Alexander Terras, Sara Temes, Christopher Lynch, Erin Schaefer, Steven Taitz, Scott Bernstein, Christine Blac Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (dcorsini) |
||
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Operating Report
Wed 01/02 10:24 AM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2018 Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Thu 12/13 11:26 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sara C. Temes on behalf of William Floyd School District (Temes, Sara) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Thu 12/13 11:19 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen A Donato on behalf of William Floyd School District (Donato, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 12/12 3:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sara C. Temes on behalf of William Floyd School District (Temes, Sara) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 12/12 3:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen A Donato on behalf of William Floyd School District (Donato, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Tue 12/04 4:11 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC (Pergament, Marc) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP)
Tue 12/04 12:45 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Marc A Pergament Holding Date: Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Wed 11/28 4:46 PM
Order Granting Motion To Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Signed on 11/28/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 1/7/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/28/2019. (cam) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Wed 11/28 4:24 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 11/21 4:01 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Franklin Funding Group LLC from 3611 14th Avenue #423, Brooklyn, NY 11218-3773 to 1425 37th Street #557, Brooklyn, NY 11218. Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP)
Tue 11/20 3:47 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett) |
||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
trustee
~Inability of United States Trustee to Appoint Creditors' Committee
Thu 11/08 2:41 PM
The United States Trustee is unable to appoint a Creditors Committee of Unsecured Creditors pursuant to 11 USC 1102(a) Filed by United States Trustee. (Dimino, Alfred) |
||
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Substantively Consolidate
Mon 11/05 10:35 AM
Motion to Substantively Consolidate Lead Case 818-76176-845 with 818-76179-825; 818-76177-845; 818-76716-845; and 818-76717-845 Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/27/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Application | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service | ||
Sunday, November 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sun 11/04 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 11/04/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/02 4:08 PM
Court's Service List (cam) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Joint Administration
Fri 11/02 3:58 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Additional Cases. on Lead Case: 18-76176 845 with Member Cases: Montauk transit Service LLC, 18-76179 845; Montauk Student Transport LLC 18-76177 845; Montauk Transit LLC 18-76716 845; East End Bus Service LLC 18-76717 845 Signed on 11/2/2018. (cam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consolidated Caption | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
motion
Joint Administration
Fri 11/02 3:24 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 18-76176 with Case(s) 18-76716 18-76717 Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Authorize/Direct
Thu 11/01 4:24 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct pursuant to Rule 1015 authorizing the Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Thu 10/25 9:15 AM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 10/22 10:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Scott H Bernstein on behalf of TCJ II, LLC (Bernstein, Scott) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Fri 10/12 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 10/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 10/12 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 10/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Fri 10/12 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 10/11/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 10/09 11:24 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/9/2018 at 10:00 AM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. Last day to determine dischargeability of a debt under Section 523 is 1/8/2019. Deadline to object to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of plan. (amp) |
|
utility
~Force Judge Assignment
Tue 10/09 10:19 AM
Assigned to Judge Louis A. Scarcella due to Related Cases 18-76176 18-76177, 18-76179 and 18-76717 (dlt) Modified on 10/9/2018 (dlt) |
||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Tue 10/09 11:05 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11: For Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204)For Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) due by 10/5/2018. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 10/5/2018. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 10/19/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 10/19/2018. Schedule G due 10/19/2018. Schedule H due 10/19/2018. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 10/19/2018. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/19/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs for Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Form 107 due 10/19/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 10/19/2018. (amp) Modified on 10/9/2018 (amp) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 10/05 12:31 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Marc A Pergament on behalf of Montauk Transit LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 02/4/2019. Disclosure Statement due by 02/4/2019. (Pergament, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Verification of Creditor Matrix | ||
Att: 2 1073b Statement | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Fri 10/05 12:32 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8 18-76716 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17183916. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |