Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:18-bk-12309
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Mar 29, 2021
Claims Deadline:Apr 29, 2021
Converted:Feb 18, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Sep 18, 2019

Debtor
ONE Aviation Corporation
3250 Spirit Drive SE
Albuquerque, NM 87106
Represented By
Nathan S. Gimpel
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Jaime Luton Chapman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Todd M. Schwartz
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Brendan M. Gage
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Nicholas A. Bassett
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
M. Blake Cleary
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Jordan E Sazant
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Jared W Kochenash
Young Conaway
contact info
Katherine Rookard
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Sean Matthew Beach
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Chris Dickerson
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Matthew R Pierce
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Wojciech F. Jung
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Cohen
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Kerri K. Mumford
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Bruce Buechler
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
Trustee
George L. Miller
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
John T. Carroll, III
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


1. One Aviation Files Chapter 11 (flyingmag.com)
Submitted Thu 10/11/2018
Docket last updated: 07/22/2024 11:00 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
1 1 34 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 10/09 11:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by ONE Aviation Corporation. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]