SAMSUNG FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE CO., LTD. (U.S. BRANCH) v. UFVS MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Chad F Kenney |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-04365 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2019 6:03 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
UFVS MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
ROOSEVELT MOTOR INN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
ROOSEVELT INN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
YAGNA PATEL
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
SAMSUNG FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE CO., LTD. (U.S. BRANCH)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
YAGNA PATEL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROOSEVELT INN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROOSEVELT MOTOR INN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UFVS MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only Party
ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
SAMSUNG FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE CO., LTD. (U.S. BRANCH)
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
YAGNA PATEL
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
ROOSEVELT INN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
ROOSEVELT MOTOR INN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
UFVS MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
146 | 146
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Thu 06/01 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re145 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment),, filed by UFVS MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC, ROOSEVELT INN, LLC, ROOSEVELT MOTOR INN, INC., YAGNA PATEL. USCA Case Number 23-1988 (fdc) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
145 | 145
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
Tue 05/30 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to141 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),,144 Judgment,,,140 Memorandum and/or Opinion by YAGNA PATEL, ROOSEVELT INN, LLC, ROOSEVELT MOTOR INN, INC., UFVS MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number APAEDC-16720196. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and(ELLISON, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2023.05.16 ORDER | ||
Att: 144 , | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2023.03.20 | ||
Att: 140 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 2023.03.20 | ||
Att: 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re_ Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings |