FG Diner Inc.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nancy Hershey Lord |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-45884 |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
FG Diner Inc.
24827 Jericho Tpke
Bellerose, NY 11426-1912 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 04/08 11:41 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (tmg) |