Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:18-bk-14095
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Jan 31, 2019
Terminated:Sep 09, 2022

Debtor
Global Baristas US LLC
2003 Western Ave Ste 660
Seattle, WA 98121-2177
Represented By
Global Baristas US LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Benenson Bellevue LP
708 3rd Ave
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Gregory P. Cavagnaro
Attorney At Law
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Skymatt Properties LLC
PO Box 182
Medina, WA 98039
Represented By
John R Tomlinson, Jr
Barokas Martin & Tomlinson
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
SP Partners III LLC
6402 Tacoma Mall Blvd
Tacoma, WA 98409
Represented By
Scott E Feir
Montgomery Purdue Blankinship & Austin
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Elizabeth Eno
12055 15th Ave NE
Seattle, WA 98125
Represented By
Matthew J Cunanan
Dc Law Group Nw PLLC
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Benenson Bellevue II LP
708 3rd Ave
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Gregory P. Cavagnaro
Attorney At Law
contact info
Trustee
Nancy L James
15008 63rd Dr SE
Snohomish, WA 98296
Represented By
Scott B Henrie
William Kastner & Gibbs PLLC
contact info
Rory C Livesey
Livesey Law Firm
contact info
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101

Docket last updated: 03/25/2019 2:46 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 and $5 overpayment by JF. Receipt Number 229512. (admin) Modified on 10/25/2018 (NSM).
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 10/24 12:52 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual. Re: Global Baristas US LLC Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Benenson Bellevue LP (attorney Gregory P. Cavagnaro), Leonard Kreppel (attorney Gregory P. Cavagnaro), Skymatt Properties LLC (attorney John R Tomlinson Jr), SP Partners III LLC (attorney Scott E Feir), Elizabeth Eno (attorney Matthew J Cunanan) , (JCF) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018 (JCF).
Related: [-]