California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jennifer E Niemann
Case #: 1:18-bk-14445
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Mar 12, 2019
Claims Deadline:Jun 13, 2019
Terminated:Sep 08, 2023

Debtor
KONARK RANCHES, LLC
2201 Tiverton Dr
Bakersfield, CA 93311-9383
Represented By
Leonard K. Welsh
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randell Parker
3820 Herring Rd
Arvin, CA 93203
Represented By
Lisa A. Holder
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721


Docket last updated: 05/10/2023 11:56 AM PDT
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
utility First Meeting - 7 Business Wed 10/31 2:18 PM
Related: [-]
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) Wed 10/31 2:22 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $335.00, Receipt Number: 345964, eFilingID: 6386549) (auto)
Related: [-]
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/18/2018 at 01:30 PM at Bakersfield Meeting Room.
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Wed 10/31 2:17 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $335.00) (Welsh, Leonard) (eFilingID: 6386549)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Master Address List Wed 10/31 2:18 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Wed 10/31 2:18 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Randell Parker (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate DEBTOR - Including Supplemental Wed 10/31 3:08 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (msts)
Related: [-]
5 5 related Support Document Wed 10/31 3:11 PM
Support Document/Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Re:1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor KONARK RANCHES, LLC (msts)
Related: [-]