Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas B Mcnamara
Case #: 1:18-bk-19570
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2018
Dismissed:Jun 03, 2019
Terminated:Jul 08, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fate Restaurants, LLC
691 Tamarisk Ct
Louisville, CO 80027-1064
Represented By
Jeffrey Weinman
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


1. Boulder brewery files bankruptcy (9news.com)
Submitted Tue 11/06/2018
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Thursday, November 14, 2019
166 166 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/14 10:43 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 165 Generic Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
165 165 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/12 11:51 AM
NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO CREDITORS LETTER Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 164 Document/Support Document