New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Andrew B Altenburg Jr
Case #: 1:18-bk-32139
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2018
Terminated:Feb 03, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Nov 12, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
James Candy Company
1519 Boardwalk
Atlantic City, NJ 08401-7012
Represented By
Ira Deiches
Deiches & Ferschmann
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102

Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, April 29, 2021
235 235 misc Ch 11 Post Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report Thu 04/29 10:46 PM
Chapter 11 Post Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report 01/01/2021 through 02/02/2021 filed by Ira Deiches on behalf of James Candy Company. (Deiches, Ira)
Related: [-]