Robeson County v. Actavis, LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46141 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 7:18-cv-00163 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:49 PM EST |
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, a/k/a Mutual Drug
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Robeson County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
Terminated: 02/05/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:33 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Att: 33
![]() |
||
Att: 34
![]() |
||
Att: 35
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet and the civil summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 10/12/2018.] | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. File transmitted electronically. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 10/12/2018.] | ||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |