Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-46269
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2018
Case in other court:Georgia Northern, 3:18-cv-00131
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:56 PM EST
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Walmart Inc.
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
Represented By
Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Bartlit Beck - Chicago
contact info
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
CVS Health Corporation
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Depomed, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
Carroll County
Represented By
William Q. Bird
Bird Law Group
contact info
Jesse Anderson Davis
Brinson Askew Berry Siegler Richardson & Davis
contact info
Robert K. Finnell, III
contact info
Samuel L. Lucas
Brinson Askew Berry Siegler Richardson & Davis
contact info
Richard G. Tisinger, Jr.
Tisinger Vance
contact info
Robert Harris Smalley, III
Mccamy Phillips Tuggle & Fordham
contact info
Paul I. Hotchkiss
Bird Law Group
contact info
Lee B. Carter
Brinson Askew Berry Siegler Richardson & Davis
contact info
John W. Crongeyer
Crongeyer Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:41 PM EDT
Friday, November 02, 2018
1 1 378 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carroll County. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8249137)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 11/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
2 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carroll County. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Davis, Jesse) [Transferred from gand on 11/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carroll County. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver mailed on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Davis, Jesse) [Transferred from gand on 11/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jlm) [Transferred from gand on 11/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. (jlm) [Transferred from gand on 11/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Certified copy of Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO67) from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jlm) [Transferred from gand on 11/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-00131. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]