Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robyn L Moberly
Case #: 1:18-bk-09108
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2018
Terminated:Aug 19, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Dec 16, 2021

Debtor
USA Gymnastics
130 E Washington St Ste 700
Indianapolis, IN 46204-4621
Represented By
Dean Panos
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Catherine L. Steege
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Melissa M. Root
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Laura A DuVall
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2020
Order Sustaining Debtor's Objection to Class Claim #531 And Denying Claimants' (1) Motion For Leave To Amend And (2) Motion To Apply Bankruptcy Rule 7023 To Class Claim (re: Doc # 885). Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. (btw)

1. Full steam ahead locally as USA Gymnastics files Chapter 11 (news10.com)
Submitted Tue 12/11/2018
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 23, 2024
1960 1960 misc Claims Register Fri 02/23 2:43 PM
Claims Register Numeric filed by Claims Agent on behalf of Interested Party Omni Agent Solutions. (Panameno, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1959 1959 misc Claims Register Fri 02/23 2:42 PM
Claims Register Alpha filed by Claims Agent on behalf of Interested Party Omni Agent Solutions. (Panameno, Nathan)
Related: [-]