Gollub et al v. City of Sausalito et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-07386 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 05, 2019 1:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Matt Butler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Sausalito
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert T. Doyle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Fotherby
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bill Fraass
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stacie Gregory
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jamie Jacob
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Jacob
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marin County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandon Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Rohrbacher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Krew, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James O.S. Gollub
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Grossman Gollub
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
136 | 136
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 03/17 11:51 AM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 135 Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
135 | 135
3
pgs
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 03/17 8:40 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL filed by City of Sausalito, Bill Fraass, Michael McKinley, Terence Moran, Brandon Rogers, John Rohrbacher. (Allman, Sara) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
134 | 134
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 03/13 12:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING HEARING TO A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2020 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) |