Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-46313
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2018
Case in other court:Maine, 2:18-cv-00282
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:58 PM EST
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Ritchie E. Berger
Dinse
contact info
Mark S. Cheffo
Dechert - New York
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By
Ritchie E. Berger
Dinse
contact info
Mark S. Cheffo
Dechert - New York
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By
Ritchie E. Berger
Dinse
contact info
Mark S. Cheffo
Dechert - New York
contact info
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Defendant
Mylan Pharms, Inc.
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Represented By
Jay S. Gregory
Gordon & Rees - Boston
contact info
Sandra Jimenez
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Rebecca H. Farnum
Thompson Bowie & Hatch
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
Stacey Anne Mahoney
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Jeff Goldman
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By
Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Bartlit Beck - Chicago
contact info
John S. Whitman
Richardson, Whitman, Large & Badger
contact info
Joseph L. Cahoon, Jr.
Richardson, Whitman, Large & Badger
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By
Daniel R. Mawhinney
Marden, Dubord, Bernier & Stevens
contact info
Christopher Lovrien
Jones Day - San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Neil K. Roman
Covington & Burling - New York
contact info
Melissa M. Hanlon
Sulloway & Hollis
contact info
Megan L. Rodgers
Covington & Burling - Redwood Shores
contact info
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Stacey Anne Mahoney
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Jeff Goldman
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maine, Inc.
Represented By
Gerald F. Petruccelli
Petruccelli, Martin & Haddow
contact info
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By
Karen Frink Wolf
Verril Dana
contact info
Ryan Zane Watts
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904
Represented By
Sigmund D. Schutz
Preti Flaherty Beliveau Pachios & Haley
contact info
Donna M. Welch
Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago
contact info
Jeff Goldman
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Stacey Anne Mahoney
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Jeff Goldman
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Stacey Anne Mahoney
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Jeff Goldman
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By
Sigmund D. Schutz
Preti Flaherty Beliveau Pachios & Haley
contact info
Donna M. Welch
Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Joshua D. Dunlap
Pierce Atwood
contact info
Kyle M. Noonan
Pierce Atwood
contact info
Louis W. Schack
Reed Smith - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By
Conor B. O'Croinin
Zuckerman Spaeder
contact info
Clifford Ruprecht
Roach Hewitt Ruprecht Sanchez & Bischoff
contact info
Geraldine G. Sanchez
Roach Hewitt Ruprecht Sanchez & Bischoff
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By
Christopher D. Hawkins
Devine, Millimet & Branch
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
Stacey Anne Mahoney
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Jeff Goldman
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Mark E. Cieniawski
Represented By
David R. Geiger
Foley Hoag
contact info
Madeleine K. Rodriguez
Foley Hoag
contact info
Mark G. Lavoie
Norman, Hanson & Detroy
contact info
Joshua D. Hadiaris
Norman, Hanson & Detroy
contact info
K. Neil Austin
Foley Hoag
contact info
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Karen Frink Wolf
Verril Dana
contact info
Ryan Zane Watts
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Washington
contact info
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Andrew J. O'Connor
Ropes & Gray - Boston
contact info
Brien T. O'Connor
Ropes & Gray - Boston
contact info
Timothy C. Woodcock
Eaton Peabody
contact info
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Douglas J. Jorgensen
Represented By
Maureen M. Sturtevant
Lambert Coffin
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Daniel Jonathan Franklin
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Perry Fine
Represented By
Jay S. Gregory
Gordon & Rees - Boston
contact info
Sandra Jimenez
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Rebecca H. Farnum
Thompson Bowie & Hatch
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Daniel Jonathan Franklin
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By
Charles C. Lifland
O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles
contact info
Daniel Jonathan Franklin
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By
J. Matthew Donohue
Holland & Knight - Portland
contact info
Katharine S. Perry
Adler, Pollock & Sheehan
contact info
Joseph L. Franco
Holland & Knight - Portland
contact info
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Represented By
Jay S. Gregory
Gordon & Rees - Boston
contact info
Sandra Jimenez
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Rebecca H. Farnum
Thompson Bowie & Hatch
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Portland
Represented By
Sumner H. Lipman
Lipman & Katz
contact info
Joseph L. Ciaccio
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
Adam R. Lee
Trafton, Matzen, Belleau & Frenette
contact info
Shayna Erin Sacks
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
Stephen C. Smith
Lipman & Katz
contact info
James E. Belleau
Trafton, Matzen, Belleau & Frenette
contact info
Hunter J. Shkolnik
Napoli Shkolnik - Melville
contact info
Paul J. Napoli
Napoli Shkolnik
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Terminated: 11/21/2018
Represented By
Sigmund D. Schutz
Preti Flaherty Beliveau Pachios & Haley
contact info
Donna M. Welch
Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/10/2019 1:26 PM EST
Friday, July 20, 2018
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-140. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 10/18/2018) Fee due by 7/23/2018.(bfa) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 docket record
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 STATE COURT RECORD filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(mnw) Modified on 7/25/2018 to correct filer to be AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cumberland County Superior Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Letter from Joseph L. Cahoon, Esq. dated July 20, 2018,
Att: 3 Cover Letter from James E. Belleau, Esq. dated July 17, 2018,
Att: 4 Cover Letter by J.D. Hadiaris, Esq. dated July 13, 2018,
Att: 5 Cover Letter by Maureen M. Sturtevant, Esq. dated July 9, 2018,
Att: 6 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated July 5, 2018,
Att: 7 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 29, 2018,
Att: 8 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 26, 2018,
Att: 9 Cover Letter by Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq. dated June 27, 2018,
Att: 10 Cover Letter by Daniel E. Will, Esq. dated June 26, 2018,
Att: 11 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 22, 2018,
Att: 12 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 18, 2018,
Att: 13 Cover Letter by Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq. dated May 31, 2018,
Att: 14 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated May 22, 2018,
Att: 15 Cover Letter by Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq. dated May 9, 2018,
Att: 16 Entry of Appearance of Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq.,
Att: 17 Cover Letter by Adam R. Lee, Esq. dated April 5, 2018,
Att: 18 Entry of Appearance by John S. Whitman, Esq. and Joseph L. Cahoon, Esq.,
Att: 19 Summons Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson,
Att: 20 Summons Returned Executed as to The Purdue Frederick Company,
Att: 21 Summons Returned Executed as to Endo Health Solutions Inc.,
Att: 22 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to McKesson Corporation,
Att: 23 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Mark Cieniawski, M.D.,
Att: 24 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation,
Att: 25 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Cardinal Health 110 LLC,
Att: 26 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Lynn Webster, M.D.,
Att: 27 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Scott Fishman, M.D.,
Att: 28 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Perry Fine, M.D.,
Att: 29 Superior Court Order dated July 17, 2018,
Att: 30 Motion of Mark Cieniawski, M.D. to Extend Time to Answer,
Att: 31 Superior Court Order dated July 13, 2018,
Att: 32 Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer,
Att: 33 Superior Court Order dated July 10, 2018,
Att: 34 Entry of Appearance of Maureen M. Sturtevant, Esq.,
Att: 35 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by Douglas J. Jorgensen, D.O.
6 6 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re5 State Court Record. Main Document: Summons Returned Executed as to Douglas J. Jorgensen, D.O..(mnw) Modified on 7/25/2018 to correct filer to be AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed as to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.,
Att: 2 Summons Returned Executed as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,
Att: 3 Sheriff's Return as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons Returned Executed as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 5 Sheriff's Return as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,
Att: 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Purdue Pharma L.P.,
Att: 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Att: 8 Summons Returned Executed as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc.,
Att: 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC,
Att: 10 Summons Returned Executed as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.,
Att: 11 Summons Returned Executed as to Insys Therapeutics, Inc.,
Att: 12 Summons Returned Executed as to Walgreen Co.,
Att: 13 Summons Returned Executed as to Purdue Pharma Inc.,
Att: 14 Sheriff's Return as to Purdue Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 15 Summons Returned Executed as to Watson Laboratories, Inc.,
Att: 16 Sheriff's Return as to Purdue Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 17 Summons as to Purdue Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 18 Summons Returned Executed as to Rite Aid of Maine, Inc.,
Att: 19 Summons Returned Executed as to Cephalon, Inc.,
Att: 20 Summons Returned Executed as to Actavis Pharma, Inc.,
Att: 21 Summons Returned Executed as to Actavis LLC,
Att: 22 Summons Returned Executed as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,
Att: 23 Superior Court Order dated July 3, 2018,
Att: 24 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation,
Att: 25 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to McKesson Corporation,
Att: 26 Superior Court Order dated June 27, 2018,
Att: 27 Superior Court Order dated June 27, 2018,
Att: 28 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by Cardinal Health Inc.,
Att: 29 Entry of Appearance for Cardinal Health, Inc.,
Att: 30 Superior Court Order dated June 25, 2018,
Att: 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service,
Att: 32 419 pgs Amended Complaint,
Att: 33 Motion to Correct Clerical Mistake in Motion to Extend Time,
Att: 34 Email Correspondence,
Att: 35 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018 re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Megan L. Rodgers, Esq.,
Att: 36 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018,
Att: 37 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018 re Pro Hac Vice Certifications,
Att: 38 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018 re Pro Hac Vice Certification of Neil K. Roman, Esq.,
Att: 39 Withdrawal of Motion,
Att: 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Attorneys,
Att: 41 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation,
Att: 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Megan L. Rodgers, Esq.,
Att: 43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil K. Roman, Esq.,
Att: 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Attorneys,
Att: 45 389 pgs Complaint
Monday, July 23, 2018
Set Answer Deadline for AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION : Answer due by 7/30/2018. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/3/2018. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines : Attorneys MARK CHEFFO,STACEY ANNE MAHONEY,CHARLES C LIFLAND,DONNA WELCH,J MATTHEW DONOHUE,BRIEN T O'CONNOR,MELISSA M HANLON,KASPAR STOFFELMAYR,CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN,SANDRA JIMENEZ shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/2/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (bfa) Modified on 7/24/2018 to correct the spelling of attorney Melissa M. Hanlon's name (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1873565.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
Set Deadlines : Attorneys HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK, JOSEPH L. CIACCIO, SHAYNA E. SACKS, MEGAN L. RODGERS, NEIL K. ROMAN & CONOR B. O'CROININ shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/2/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/14/2018. (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Remand to State Court by CITY OF PORTLAND (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
58 58 RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (No PDF document attached. See PDF document7 ) filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Reply due by 8/24/2018. (jwr) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from Attorneys HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK, JOSEPH L. CIACCIO, SHAYNA E. SACKS, MARK CHEFFO, STACEY ANNE MAHONEY, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, DONNA WELCH, J MATTHEW DONOHUE, BRIEN O'CONNOR, MEGAN L. RODGERS, NEIL K. ROMAN, CONOR B. O'CROININ, KASPAR STOFFELMAYR, SANDRA JIMENEZ & CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN by 8/2/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Answer Deadlines for PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC & MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC : Per the July 13, 2018 Order entered by the Cumberland County Superior Court (ECF No. 5-31) : Answers due by 9/10/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Answer Deadline for MCKESSON CORPORATION : Per the July 3, 2018 Order entered by the Cumberland County Superior Court (ECF No. 6-23) : Answer due by 9/10/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Answer Deadline for CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC : Per the June 27, 2018 Order entered by the Cumberland County Superior Court (ECF No.6-26) : Answer due by 9/12/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Answer Deadline for MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD : Per the July 17, 2018 Order entered by the Cumberland County Superior Court (ECF No. 5-29) : Answer due by 10/1/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Answer Deadlines for AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, PERRY FINE, MD, SCOTT FISHMAN, MD, LYNN WEBSTER, MD & WAL-MART STORES INC : In accordance with Fed. R.Civ. P. 81(c)(2): Answers due by 7/27/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines : Attorney Paul J. Napoli shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/2/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from Attorney Paul J. Napoli by 8/2/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO Responses due by 8/15/2018. (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
11 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CITY OF PORTLAND. (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
12 12 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875165.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION for Conference of Counsel by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/15/2018.(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript of Telephonic Proceedings in re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litigation #1:17-cv-2804,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order Regarding Remands, #1:17-MD-2804
14 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875203.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
15 15 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC & MCKESSON CORPORATION. Responses due by 8/15/2018. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) Modified on 7/26/2018 to add filers Cardinal Health 110 LLC & McKesson Corporation (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
16 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Napoli filed by JAMES E. BELLEAU on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875209.) (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
17 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madeleine K. Rodriguez filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875212.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
18 18 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hunter Shkolnik, Shayna Sacks, Joseph Ciaccio filed by JAMES E. BELLEAU on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1875217.)(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification for Admission PHV Shayna E. Sacks,
Att: 2 Affidavit Certification for Admission PHV Joseph Ciaccio
19 19 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WAL-MART STORES INC & RITE AID OF MAINE INC. Responses due by 8/15/2018. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) Modified on 7/26/2018 to add filers Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Rite Aid of Maine (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON for all further referral proceedings. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
Set Deadlines : Attorney Madeleine K. Rodriguez shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/2/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE M. NOONAN on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (NOONAN, KYLE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
22 22 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875665.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
23 23 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Request for Expedited Conference by CITY OF PORTLAND(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order on Remand - Spartanburg SC,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order on Remand - Greenville SC
24 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 8/17/2018.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order I,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Lac Courte Oreilles,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Order Rancheria,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order Kentucky,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Transfer Order II
25 25 ORDER granting13 Motion for Conference of Counsel. The Court will schedule a telephonic conference to discuss the future course of the case. Pending the conference, the deadlines for the parties' responses to Plaintiff's complaint and the pending motions are stayed. Until the Court has conducted the telephonic conference, the parties shall file no further pleadings without leave of court. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
Set Deadlines : Attorney Ryan Zane Watts shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/7/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC & ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC by 8/7/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines : Attorney Louis W. Schack shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/7/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
26 26 NOTICE of Appearance by SUMNER H. LIPMAN on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (LIPMAN, SUMNER) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. SMITH on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (SMITH, STEPHEN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
28 28 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stacey Anne Mahoney filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877557.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
29 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan L. Rodgers, Esq. filed by MELISSA M. HANLON on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877584.) (HANLON, MELISSA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
30 30 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil K. Roman, Esq. filed by MELISSA M. HANLON on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877592.) (HANLON, MELISSA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WAL-MART STORES INC (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
32 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WAL-MART STORES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877863.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
33 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
34 34 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877901.) (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
35 35 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
36 36 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/2/2018 at 3:30 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's conference number.(MFS) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
37 37 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Louis W. Schack filed by JOSHUA D. DUNLAP on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1878047.) (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
Set Deadlines : Attorney Joseph L. Franco shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/8/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
38 38 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHARINE S. PERRY on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC (PERRY, KATHARINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
39 39 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Donohue filed by KATHARINE S. PERRY on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1878383.) (PERRY, KATHARINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
40 40 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD RUPRECHT on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (RUPRECHT, CLIFFORD) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
41 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (RUPRECHT, CLIFFORD) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
42 42 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph L. Franco filed by KATHARINE S. PERRY on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1878544.) (PERRY, KATHARINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
43 43 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC (MAHONEY, STACEY) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
44 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (MAHONEY, STACEY) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
45 45 MOTION by Attorney Stephen C. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/23/2018. (SMITH, STEPHEN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
46 46 MOTION by Attorney Sumner H. Lipman to Withdraw as Attorney by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/23/2018. (LIPMAN, SUMNER) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
47 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (WHITMAN, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
48 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
49 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID OF MAINE INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
50 50 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
51 51 ORDER granting45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Smith is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
52 52 ORDER granting46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lipman is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
53 53 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew J. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1879250.)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andrew J. O'Connor
54 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
55 55 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Supplement authority in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by CITY OF PORTLAND(BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supplemental authority: State of New Mexico ex rel. Balderas v. Purdue Pharma
56 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: FTR) (MFS) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
Reset Deadlines per Procedural Order as to7 MOTION to Remand to State Court entered this date: Responses due by 8/24/2018. No reply to be filed. (jwr) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
57 57 PROCEDURAL ORDER granting9 15 and19 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer;7 Motion to Remand is also a response to24 Motion to Stay; Response to7 Motion to Remand and Reply to24 Motion to Stay due 8/24/18. No reply to be filed to7 Motion to Remand By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
59 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Actavis LLC served on 7/31/2018 (BELLEAU, JAMES) Modified on 8/6/2018 to add text to indicate defendant served and date of service (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
60 60 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 7/25/2018 (BELLEAU, JAMES) Modified on 8/6/2018 to add text to indicate defendant served and date of service (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
61 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
Reset Deadlines : A review of the docket reflects that attorneys MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, DONNA WELCH, KASPAR STOFFELMAYR and SANDRA JIMENEZ have yet to file their Pro Hac Vice Certification forms. Pro Hac Vice Certificates due by 8/15/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at [LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : A review of the docket reflects that attorneys CHARLES C. LIFLAND, CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN, DONNA WELCH, KASPAR STOFFELMAYR, MARK CHEFFO and SANDRA JIMENEZ have not yet registered for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System. These Attorneys shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/15/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website [LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines : A review of the docket reflects that defendants PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ALLERGAN PLC, ACTAVIS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC and CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC have yet to file their Corporate Disclosure Statements. Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/15/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
62 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC. (PERRY, KATHARINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 09, 2018
63 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
64 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
65 65 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch, P.C. filed by DONNA WELCH on behalf of ALLERGAN PLC and ACTAVIS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1885857.) (WELCH, DONNA) Modified on 8/16/2018 to remove filer Allergan Finance LLC as Allergan Finance LLC is not a named defendant in the Amended Complaint and to add filer Actavis Inc (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
66 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS INC (WELCH, DONNA) Modified on 8/16/2018 to update filer to be Actavis Inc (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
67 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN PLC . (WELCH, DONNA) Modified on 8/16/2018 to clean up text (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
68 68 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding65 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice and66 Corporate Disclosure Statement : Docket entries modified by the Clerk's Office to remove filer Allergan Finance LLC as Allergan Finance LLC is not a named defendant in the Amended Complaint. Added filer Actavis Inc as Actavis Inc is the defendant named in the Amended Complaint. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
Reset Deadlines : Attorneys MARK CHEFFO, KASPAR STOFFELMAYR & SANDRA JIMENEZ shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/27/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, KASPAR STOFFELMAYR & SANDRA JIMENEZ by 8/27/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 8/27/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
69 69 MOTION for Enlargement of Pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Stay and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION Responses due by 9/13/2018. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
70 70 ORDER granting69 Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from JAY S. GREGORY due by 8/31/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms (lrc) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
71 71 RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ,7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 8/3/18 Procedural Order filed by CVS PHARMACY INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, PERRY FINE, SCOTT FISHMAN, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WAL-MART STORES INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, LYNN WEBSTER, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, CEPHALON INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. Reply due by 9/7/2018.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/12/2018 to add filers AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, CEPHALON INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC (mnw). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order re Village of Melrose Park,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order re City of Jacksonville
72 72 MOTION for Leave to File Limited Motion to Dismiss by MARK E CIENIAWSKI Responses due by 9/14/2018.(AUSTIN, K) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Monday, August 27, 2018
Reset Deadlines as to72 MOTION for Leave to File Limited Motion to Dismiss- per Magistrate Judge Nivison: Responses due by 9/7/2018. No replies shall be permitted. (lrc) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
73 73 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay S. Gregory filed by JAY S. GREGORY on behalf of PERRY FINE, SCOTT FISHMAN, LYNN WEBSTER (GREGORY, JAY) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
74 74 MOTION by Attorney Kaspar Stoffelmayr to Withdraw as Attorney by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC Responses due by 9/19/2018. (CAHOON, JOSEPH) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
75 75 ORDER granting74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stoffelmayr is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
76 76 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Supplemental Authority Dkt. No. 24 by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - County of San Mateo Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Borough of Ridgefield Order
77 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re72 MOTION for Leave to File Limited Motion to Dismiss filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Reply due by 9/21/2018. (BELLEAU, JAMES) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
Reset Deadlines : Attorneys SANDRA JIMENEZ and MARK CHEFFO shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/17/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND & SANDRA JIMENEZ by 9/17/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 9/17/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
78 78 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding71 Response to Motion to Stay: Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to add filers AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, CEPHALON INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC & CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
Reset Deadlines : Attorneys SANDRA JIMENEZ and MARK CHEFFO shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 9/21/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration] under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND & SANDRA JIMENEZ by 9/21/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC & JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC by 9/21/2018. (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
79 79 ORDER granting72 Motion for Leave to File Limited Motion to Dismiss. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
80 80 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARK E CIENIAWSKI Responses due by 10/23/2018. (RODRIGUEZ, MADELEINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
Set Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 10/22/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at[LINK:http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms] . (MFS) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
81 81 ORDER re: Pro Hac Vice Certificates. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
82 82 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Franklin filed by CHRISTOPHER R. DRURY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1917291.) (DRURY, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
83 83 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Lifland filed by CHRISTOPHER R. DRURY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1917292.) (DRURY, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
84 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, and JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (DRURY, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 10/22/2018 to add filer ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS(slg). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 22, 2018
85 85 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding84 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Modified by the Clerk's Office to add filer ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS (slg) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
86 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re80 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Reply due by 11/6/2018. (LEE, ADAM) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
87 87 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/7/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey Graf. (slg) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
88 88 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RICHIE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
89 89 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RICHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1919020.) (BERGER, RICHIE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
90 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
91 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re80 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK E CIENIAWSKI. (RODRIGUEZ, MADELEINE) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
92 92 RESPONSE TO87 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CITY OF PORTLAND.(SACKS, SHAYNA) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 08, 2018
SET Deadlines Per Order #93: Dismissal without prejudice as to Allergan PLC due by 11/23/2018. Motion to Complaint as to add Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis LLC due by 11/23/2018. (slg) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
93 93 ORDER terminating87 Order to Show Cause. The request for time included in the response to the Order to Show Cause is granted. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
94 94 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY by CITY OF PORTLAND. (BELLEAU, JAMES) Modified on 11/21/2018 to change event type to motion (slg). [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 21, 2018
95 95 ORDER granting94 Motion to Substitute Party. ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC added. ALLERGAN PLC terminated By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (slg) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
96 96 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CITY OF PORTLAND and24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION. Objections to R&R due by 12/12/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
97 97 MDL TRANSFER ORDER (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
98 98 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (mnw) [Transferred from med on 12/11/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
99 99 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maine. Case number 2:18-cv-00282. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]