Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00458
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2018
Terminated:Jun 07, 2019
Last checked: Friday Dec 14, 2018 3:15 AM EST
Defendant
Jun Ho Choi (1)
Represented By
David Barry Benowitz
Price Benowitz Llp (dc)
contact info
Mary Margret Nerino
Price Benowitz LLP
contact info
Anna Katherine Dvorchik
The Law Office Of Anna K Dvorchik
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexander Patrick Berrang
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2020 9:44 PM EDT
Thursday, October 25, 2018
1 1 1 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Jun Ho Choi (1). (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Jun Ho Choi1 Complaint (Sealed) (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
3 3 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet. (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Jun Ho Choi. (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal Case until the defendant is arrested as to Jun Ho Choi (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/25/18. (kbar) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson in case as to Jun Ho Choi. (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
Case unsealed as to Jun Ho Choi (lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Barry Benowitz appearing for Jun Ho Choi. (kbar) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/31/2018 in case as to Jun Ho Choi. (lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Initial Appearance as to Jun Ho Choi held on 10/31/2018. US appeared through: Alex Berrang. Deft appeared with counsel: David Benowitz. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Gov't is seeking detention-GRANTED pending PH/DH. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 02:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
11 11 Temporary Detention Order as to Jun Ho Choi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/31/2018. (lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Preliminary Hearing as to Jun Ho Choi held on 11/1/2018. US appeared through; Alex Berrang. Deft appeared with counsel: David Benowitz. Matter came on for a PH/DH. Deft waives PH. Court finds PC. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing as to Jun Ho Choi held on 11/1/2018. Gov't is seeking detention. Deft argues for release with conditions-DENIED. Deft remanded to the custody of the USMS due to risk of non appearance and the safety of the community. Deft reserves the right of the Courts determination as to detention based on a change of circumstances. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jun Ho Choi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/02/2018. (lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
14 14 Protective Order as to Jun Ho Choi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/2/18. (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
15 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re13 Order of Detention by Jun Ho Choi.(Benowitz, David) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Bond Conditions by Jun Ho Choi.(Benowitz, David) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 Sealed Exhibit A re15 MOTION for Reconsideration re13 Order of Detention filed by Jun Ho Choi (kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
21 21 ORDER granting16 Motion to Seal as to Jun Ho Choi (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/08/2018. (jlan) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
Set Deadlines re Motion in case as to Jun Ho Choi15 MOTION for Reconsideration re13 Order of Detention . Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
18 18 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jun Ho Choi re15 MOTION for Reconsideration re13 Order of Detention (Berrang, Alexander) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
19 19 Notice of Hearing Date November 16, 2018, 10:00 am re15 MOTION for Reconsideration re13 Order of Detention (Benowitz, David) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Margret Nerino appearing for Jun Ho Choi (Nerino, Mary) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Motion Hearing as to Jun Ho Choi held on 11/16/2018 re15 MOTION for Reconsideration re13 Order of Detention filed by Jun Ho Choi. US appeared through: Alex Berrang. Deft appeared with counsel: Mary Nerino. Motion argued and granted. Deft placed on PR bond with conditions. Deft remanded until all conditions are met. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jun Ho Choi (1) PR Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/16/2018. (lgue, ) (Main Document 23 replaced on 11/16/2018) (lgue, ). [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
24 24 PR Bond Entered as to Jun Ho Choi (lgue, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
25 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA, Jun Ho Choi as to Jun Ho Choi.(kbar, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 ORDER granting up to and including December 14, 2018 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Jun Ho Choi (1). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/26/2018. (lcre, ) [1:18-mj-00511-IDD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
Set Hearing as to Jun Ho Choi: Arraignment set for 12/21/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
27 27 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Jun Ho Choi (1) count(s) 1, 2. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (pmil, )
Related: [-]