California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 5:18-cv-07533
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2019 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Claire Celeste Bonelli
Morrison And Foerster
contact info
Tiffany Cheung
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Sabrina Larson
Morrison And Foerster, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney Davis
Represented By
David Alan Makman
The Law Offices Of David A. Makman
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Sponchiado
Represented By
David Alan Makman
The Law Offices Of David A. Makman
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, January 04, 2019
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 01/04 3:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/04 12:14 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Courtney Davis, Christian Sponchiado.. (Makman, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/03 4:12 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CK Lee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12970846.) filed by Courtney Davis, Christian Sponchiado.(Makman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CK LEE CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 12/18 5:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/2/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 12/14 3:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 12/14 1:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 12/14 12:36 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/14 11:46 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Courtney Davis, Christian Sponchiado . (Makman, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 12/14 11:02 AM
Proposed Summons. (Makman, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/14 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12928935.). Filed byChristian Sponchiado, Courtney Davis.(Makman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 12/14 11:31 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be randomly assigned to Judge by Clerk due to lack of filing completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please complete and file current Civil Cov er Sheet JS-CAND 44 Related [+] as separate docket entry Re:1 Complaint filed by Christian Sponchiado, Courtney Davis (bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] v 06/17