Cecchi Gori Pictures et al v. Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-53499
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-53499
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | M Elaine Hammond |
Case #: | 5:18-ap-05068 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Dec 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP
125 Park Avenue 25th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Berlandi
125 Park Avenue 25th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecchi Gori Pictures
Diamond McCarthy LLP 150 California Street Suite 2200
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.
Diamond McCarthy LLP 150 California Street Suite 2200
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 11/13 12:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed 5:18-ap-5068. (jf) |
||
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
order
Stipulation
Thu 10/03 1:33 PM
Order Granting Dismissal With Prejudice . (acr) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/02 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
34 | 34
stip
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/02 4:00 PM
Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.. Case Management Action due after 10/16/2019. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Stipulation
Mon 07/29 11:32 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Status Conference And Defendants' Deadline to Respond To Second Amended Complaint Based Upon Parties' Intent To Participate In Mediation . (acr) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Adv )
Mon 07/29 11:33 AM
Hearing Continued . Hearing scheduled for 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond for 7 , . (acr) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
stip
Continue Hearing
Mon 07/22 4:24 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing (status conference) and defendants' deadline to respond to second amended complaint based upon parties' intent to participate in mediation Filed by Defendants Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Adv )
Fri 07/12 9:59 AM
Hearing Continued Per Chambers . Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond for 7 , . (rdr) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/10 1:17 PM
Certificate of Service re Joint Status Report and Request to Continue Status Conference . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Status Conference Statement
Wed 07/10 1:15 PM
Joint Status Conference Statement Joint Status Report and Request to Continue Status Conference Based Upon Defendants' July 18, 2019 Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document #3. Related document(s)3 Summons Issued. Modified on 7/11/2019 (yw) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/20 12:52 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/20 12:47 PM
Amended Complaint Corrected Second Amended Complaint by Jason B. Komorsky on behalf of Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. against Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/17 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/17 12:48 PM
Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Jason B. Komorsky on behalf of Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. against Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 06/10 10:59 AM
Brian Berlandi Answer Deadline Reset for 7/1/2019; Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP Answer Deadline Reset for 7/1/2019. (acr) |
||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/10 10:58 AM
Order Denying Defendants Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP And Brian Berlandi's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint In Its Entirety (acr) |
|
24 | 24
order
Stipulation
Fri 06/07 1:45 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Re Filing of Second Amended Complaint . (acr) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Amended Document
Fri 05/31 10:37 AM
Stipulation to File Amended Document Filed by Defendant Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. (Larson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Re filing of second amended complaint | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 05/31 9:40 AM
Hearing Continued Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 at 10:00 AM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. Continued by the court prior to the hearing. (acr) |
||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice
Wed 05/29 4:13 PM
Notice Regarding Notice of Lodgment of Proposed Order Denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint in its Entirety . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
audio
audio
Fri 05/24 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/24/2019 9:30:51 AM ]. File Size [ 3940 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:25 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Fri 05/24 9:50 AM
Oral Ruling Held Jason Komorsky appearing on behalf of the Plaintiff and Nicholas Larson for the Defendants. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is denied. Counsel may upload an order. (rdr) |
||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Set
Tue 05/21 11:55 AM
Oral Ruling Set On . Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2019 at 09:30 AM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. (acr) |
||
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
audio
audio
Mon 05/20 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/20/2019 11:16:52 AM ]. File Size [ 4732 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:43 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Mon 05/20 2:25 PM
Hearing Held Appearances: Jason Komorsky and Ori Katz appeared on behalf of the plaintiff and Thomas Mazzucco and Nicholas Larson appeared for the defendant. The motion to dismiss is under submission. The court will issue an oral ruling shortly (acr) |
||
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Reply
Mon 05/13 5:56 PM
Reply in support opf motion to dismiss adversary complaint . Filed by Defendants Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP (Mazzucco, Thomas) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/06 2:46 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Request to Take Judicial Notice
Mon 05/06 2:44 PM
Request To Take Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Mon 05/06 2:35 PM
Opposition Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/18 5:10 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. Filed by Defendants Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. (Mazzucco, Thomas) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/18 5:07 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. (Mazzucco, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities | ||
Att: 2 Declaration and Exhibits | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibits | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Thu 04/11 5:08 PM
Notice Regarding Notice of Withdrawal of Docket No. 11 Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 04/11 4:56 PM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Brian Berlandi 4/8/2019; Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP 4/8/2019 with Certificate of Service . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 04/11 3:26 PM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Brian Berlandi 4/8/2019; Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP 4/8/2019 with Certificate of Service . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/03 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Alias Summons Issued
Mon 04/01 10:00 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Brian Berlandi Date Issued 4/1/2019, Answer Due 5/1/2019; Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP Date Issued 4/1/2019, Answer Due 5/1/2019 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. (wbk) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
cmp
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued
Fri 03/29 2:37 PM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. Reason: Amended Complaint filed, original complaint not served. . (Komorsky, Jason) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/25 4:12 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/25 3:44 PM
Amended Complaint by Jason B. Komorsky on behalf of Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. against Brian Berlandi, Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Extend Time
Mon 03/11 1:48 PM
Order Extending Time Within Which To Serve Complaint and Continuing Status Conference (acr) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Mon 03/11 1:53 PM
Hearing Continued Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. (acr) |
||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/08 2:58 PM
Certificate of Service on 1) Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement and Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time Within Which to Serve Complaint; and 2) Order Granting Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time Within Which to Serve Complaint . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Gubner, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extend Time
Fri 03/08 2:50 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement and Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time Within Which to Serve Complaint Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.. (Gubner, Steven) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Fri 12/14 11:15 AM
Summons Issued on Brian Berlandi Answer Due 1/14/2019; Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP Answer Due 1/14/2019 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. (aw) |
|
2 | 2
order
Discovery
Fri 12/14 11:12 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (aw) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/13 4:46 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-05068 . 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) Complaint by Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. against Berlandi Nussbaum & Reitzas LLP, Brian Berlandi. Fee Amount $350. (Sullivan, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet |